Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referred: Natalie Hirt Adams
Case #: 8:25-cv-00707
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 5:00 AM EDT
Defendant
Insurify, Inc
Plaintiff
Stephen Knuth
Represented By
Gerald D Lane, Jr
The Law Offices Of Jibrael S. Hindi, PLLC
contact info
Faaris Kamal Uddin
The Law Offices Of Jibrael S. Hindi
contact info
Zane Charles Hedaya
The Law Offices Of Jibrael S. Hindi
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
7 7 service Waiver of service executed Tue 04/15 2:24 PM
WAIVER of service returned executed on April 10, 2025 by Stephen Knuth as to Insurify, Inc. (Hedaya, Zane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program Wed 04/02 8:14 AM
NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (CDR)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
5 5 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 03/24 8:54 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Natalie Hirt Adams. New case number: 8:25-cv-707-CEH-NHA. (ARL)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Fri 03/21 8:45 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Gerald D Lane, Jr on behalf of Stephen Knuth. Lead Counsel: Gerald D. Lane, Jr.. (Lane, Gerald)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Fri 03/21 8:44 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Stephen Knuth. (Lane, Gerald)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of a Related Action Fri 03/21 8:42 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Stephen Knuth. Related case(s): No (Lane, Gerald)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 03/21 8:39 PM
COMPLAINT against Insurify, Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-23158062) filed by Stephen Knuth.(Lane, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons