AIGP 13TEN, LLC v. Banks
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | J P Boulee |
Referred: | J Elizabeth Mcbath |
Case #: | 1:25-cv-01509 |
Nature of Suit | 230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment |
Cause | 28:1446 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2025 |
Terminated: | Apr 11, 2025 |
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 5:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
Byron Banks
and All Others 5053 Bent Tree Loop
Stone Mountain, GA 30083 |
|
Plaintiff
AIGP 13TEN, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, April 11, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Case electronically remanded to Magistrate Court of DeKalb County re5 Order. Certified copy of remand order sent electronically. Filing Status: Accepted.(gww) (gww). Modified on 4/11/2025 (gww) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
5 | 5
![]() ORDER adopting3 Final Report and Recommendation. For the reasons stated in the Magistrate Judges Report and Recommendation, this case is hereby REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of DeKalb County, Georgia for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/11/2025. (gww) |
|
utility
Submission to District Judge
Fri 04/11 8:40 AM
Submission of3 Final Report and Recommendation to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jkl) |
||
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Fri 04/11 9:00 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Byron Banks re5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (gww) |
||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Fri 04/11 9:03 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (gww) |
||
Monday, March 24, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() ORDER for Service of3 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 3/24/2025. (gww) |
|
3 | 3
![]() FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re2 Notice of Removal filed by Byron Banks,1 ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis. The Court RECOMMENDS that this case be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of DeKalb County, Georgia for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Defendants IFP application, Doc.1 , is GRANTED for remand purposes only. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 3/24/2025. (gww) |
|
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Byron Banks.(gww) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Mon 03/24 11:15 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Byron Banks re3 Final Report and Recommendation,4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (gww) |
||
Friday, March 21, 2025 | ||
1 | 1
![]() APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Byron Banks.(gww) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Fri 03/21 3:29 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath. (gww) |