Alabama Middle District Court
Judge:R Austin Huffaker, Jr
Case #: 2:25-cv-00219
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2025
Last checked: Sunday May 04, 2025 3:56 AM CDT
Appellant
ServisFirst
Represented By
Jeremy Lowery Retherford
Balch & Bingham
contact info
Appellee
Bankruptcy Administrator
U.S. Bankruptcy Administrator One Church Street
Montgomery, AL 36104
Represented By
Britt Batson Griggs
U. S. Bankruptcy Administrator - Alm
contact info
Appellee
Jackson Hospital & Clinic, Inc.
Attn: Human Resources 1725 Pine Street
Montgomery, AL 36106
Represented By
Derek Firth Meek
Burr & Forman
contact info
Marc Peter Solomon
Burr & Forman LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
4 4 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Tue 04/22 11:24 AM
ORDER: it is ORDERED as follows: (1) ServisFirst Bank's Motion to Consolidate Related Appeals (doc. 3 ) filed in Case Number 2:25-cv-219-RAH is GRANTED; (2) UMB Bank, N.A.'s Motion to Consolidate Related Appeals (doc. 10) filed in Case Number 2:25-cv-218-RAH is GRANTED; (3) Case Numbers 2:25-cv-218-RAH and 2:25-cv-219-RAH are hereby CONSOLIDATED for all further proceedings. All future pleadings and motions shall be filed in the lead case (2:25-cv-218-RAH) only. (4) The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to file a copy of this order in both cases. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. on 4/22/2025. (BES)
Related: [-]
utility Create Case Association Tue 04/22 11:29 AM
Member case associated; Lead case designated as 2:25-cv-00218-RAH. (BES)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
3 3 motion Consolidate Cases Fri 04/18 4:52 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by ServisFirst. Related [+]
Related: [-] therford, Jeremy
Thursday, April 17, 2025
2 2 appeal Bankruptcy Designation of Record Thu 04/17 3:24 PM
Bankruptcy Clerk's Transmittal of Appellant's and Appellee's Designation of Record on appeal, which was filed with the US Bankruptcy Court.(BES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 DE 250 - Notice of Appeal,
Att: 2 Docket Sheet,
Att: 3 DE 381 - Appellee Designation of Record,
Att: 4 DE 72 - Briefing Schedule Order,
Att: 5 DE 300 - Response,
Att: 6 DE 323 - Appellant Designation of Record,
Att: 7 DE 9 - Declartion,
Att: 8 DE 10 - Motion to use Case Collateral,
Att: 9 DE 16 - Motion for Order,
Att: 10 DE 17 - Motion for Order,
Att: 11 DE 33 - Amended Motion for Authorization,
Att: 12 DE 34 - Order,
Att: 13 DE 35 - Amended Motion Amended & Restated,
Att: 14 DE 39 - Witness List,
Att: 15 DE 40 - Objection to Debtors Motion,
Att: 16 DE 43 - Objection to Objection,
Att: 17 DE 56 - Order,
Att: 18 DE 68 - Interim Order,
Att: 19 DE 69 - Interim Order Authorizing Debtors,
Att: 20 DE 127 - Transcript 2/5/2025,
Att: 21 DE 128 - Transcript 2/5/2025,
Att: 22 DE 146 - Objection to Debtors Motion,
Att: 23 DE 147 - Objection to Renewed Objection,
Att: 24 DE 149 - Objection to Motion,
Att: 25 DE 151 - Supplemental Objection,
Att: 26 DE 162 - Notice of Filing,
Att: 27 DE 180 - Final Order,
Att: 28 DE 210 - Transcript 3/4/2025,
Att: 29 DE 211 - Transcript 3/4/2025,
Att: 30 DE 213 - Emergency Motion to Extend Time,
Att: 31 DE 259 - Order,
Att: 32 DE 264 - Emergency Motion to Stay Pending Appeal,
Att: 33 DE 265 - Motion to Stay,
Att: 34 DE 290 - Transcript 3/6/2025,
Att: 35 DE 291 - Transcript 3/6/2025,
Att: 36 DE 299 - Response,
Att: 37 DE 301 - Objection,
Att: 38 DE 302 - Response,
Att: 39 DE 311 - Supporting Motion to Stay,
Att: 40 DE 309 - Reply
Thursday, March 20, 2025
1 1 appeal Bankruptcy Appeal Fri 03/21 4:40 PM
Bankruptcy Clerk's TRANSMITTAL OF NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT; Bankruptcy Court case number 25-30256 (BES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Appeal - DE 250,
Att: 2 Order - DE 180,
Att: 3 USBC Certified Docket Sheet