Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert W Schroeder, III
Case #: 4:25-cv-00295
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2025
Terminated:May 01, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 3:37 AM CDT
Defendant
Hartford Fire Ins. Co.
Plaintiff
Laurell Wardworth
Represented By
Yusuf Farhan Buttar
The Sanford Firm
contact info
Kyla Gail Cole
Cole Legler PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 05/01 12:08 PM
ORDER. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Docket No.3 ) is accepted by the Court, and Plaintiff Laurell Wardworth's claims against Defendant are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that any pending motions in the above-captioned case are DENIED-AS MOOT. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 5/1/2025. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 04/30 11:10 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Laurell Wardworth(Cole, Kyla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 27, 2025
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 03/27 4:01 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Hartford Fire Ins. Co., filed by Laurell Wardworth.(Cole, Kyla)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 03/24 11:04 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (CLC)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Mon 03/24 11:04 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (CLC)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 03/21 7:47 PM
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against HARTFORD FIRE INS. CO ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10740847.), filed by LAURELL WARDWORTH.(Cole, Kyla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet