Idaho District Court
Judge:B Lynn Winmill
Referred: Raymond E Patricco, Jr
Case #: 1:25-cv-00170
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 2:39 AM MDT
Defendant
Workcare, Inc
Represented By
Brittney Camille Adams
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, Llp - Spokane
contact info
Kelly M Drew
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, Llp - Spokane
contact info
Plaintiff
Dr. Anne Christine Zender-Princeton
Represented By
Jeffrey J. Hepworth
Hepworth Law Offices
contact info
J. Grady Hepworth
Hepworth Law Offices
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Thursday, April 10, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 04/10 10:20 AM
REFERRAL ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: ALL MATTERS in the above case are referred to United States Magistrate Raymond E. Patricco. Judge Patricco is directed to conduct all necessary and proper proceedings pertaining thereto. Signed by Senior Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
6 6 utility Declination of Consent to MJ AND Reassignment of Case Wed 04/09 2:16 PM
DECLINATION OF CONSENT TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE FILED AND REASSIGNMENT OF CASE. Case reassigned to Senior Judge B. Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. US Magistrate Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:25-cv-00170-BLW (lm)
Related: [-]
notice Consent Deadline Reminder- MJ Wed 04/09 7:59 AM
NOTICE OF DECLINATION DEADLINE: You will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge UNLESS you email a declination of consent form to the Clerk of Court within the time frame set forth in2 Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline. * Declinations are not to be filed in the case and should be emailed in pdf form to consents@id.uscourts.gov. No Judge will be informed of a party's response. (lm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
5 5 order Litigation Order Thu 03/27 3:22 PM
LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan due by 5/8/2025. Video Scheduling Conference set for 5/15/2025 09:00 AM in Video Zoom before US Magistrate Judge Raymond Edward Patricco Jr. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (hs)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/26 3:10 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Workcare, Inc. (Adams, Brittney)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/24 4:34 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Workcare, Inc.(Drew, Kelly)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline Mon 03/24 8:31 AM
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent Form sent to counsel for Dr. Anne Christine Zender-Princeton, Workcare, Inc re1 Notice of Removal, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 4/23/2025. (lm)
Related: [-]
service Return of Service/Process Assumed Mon 03/24 8:29 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Workcare, Inc served on 3/21/2025. (service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (lm)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 03/24 8:32 AM
DOCKET TEXT NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Workcare, Inc are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lm)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 03/21 5:26 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WORKCARE, INC. from Ada County District Court, case number CV01 25-03232 (Filing fee $405 receipt numberAIDDC-2900544.), filed by WORKCARE, INC..(Adams, Brittney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 State Court Complaint Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial,
Att: 3 State Court Docket Sheet State Court Docket,
Att: 4 Summons Summons- WorkCare, Inc.,
Att: 5 Summons Summons- WorkCare Medical Group, Inc.