New Mexico District Court
Judge:Steven C Yarbrough
Referred: Jennifer M Rozzoni
Case #: 1:25-cv-00295
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2025
Terminated:May 01, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 2:55 AM MDT
Defendant
John Doe 1
Defendant
John Doe 2
Defendant
John Doe 3
Defendant
Simon Hughes
Defendant
Rationalwiki Foundation, Inc.
122 Girard Ave NE
Albuquerque, NM 87106
Defendant
Trent Toulouse
8715 Opportunity Dr NE
Albuquerque, NM 87109
Defendant
Larry Will
Plaintiff
Jan te Nijenhuis
Represented By
Aaron Cress
Late Night Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
6 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Jan te Nijenhuis (Cress, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
5 5 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re4 Summons Returned Executed by Jan te Nijenhuis (Cress, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
4 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jan te Nijenhuis. Rationalwiki Foundation, Inc. served on 4/2/2025, answer due 4/23/2025. (Cress, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Summons Issued as to John Doe 1, Simon Hughes, Trent Toulouse, Larry Will. (jg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
Summons Issued as to Rationalwiki Foundation, Inc.. (dr)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni assigned. (bc)
Related: [-]
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
1 1 20 pgs COMPLAINT Verified Complaint for Damages against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Jan te Nijenhuis.(Cress, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number ANMDC-9848029 (fs)
Related: [-]