Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:25-mj-00541
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 2:28 AM CDT
Defendant
Angel Sarmiento-Hernandez (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - McAllen
contact info
Miguel Arturo Andres Nogueras
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Lee Alfred Fry
Office Of U.S. Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/22/2025 3:57 AM CDT
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
Arrest of Angel Sarmiento-Hernandez, filed. (ngb7)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Angel Sarmiento-Hernandez (1), filed. (Starr) Initial Appearance set for 3/20/2025 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano (ngb7)
Related: [-]