Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-01384
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 12:18 AM MST
Defendant
Marcos David Garcia-Contreras (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Schuyler Jefferson Smith
Us Attorneys Office - Yuma, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/22/2025 1:39 AM MST
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
Arrest of Marcos David Garcia-Contreras on 3/19/2025. (JMA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Marcos David Garcia-Contreras. (JMA)
Related: [-]