Texas Western District Court
Case #: 4:25-mj-00146
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2025
Terminated:Mar 20, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 2:23 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Duty AUSA Pecos
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Daniel Miranda (1)
Terminated: 03/20/2025


Docket last updated: 03/22/2025 3:52 AM CDT
Thursday, March 20, 2025
1 1 Arrest (Rule 5/Rule 32.1) of Daniel Miranda (jh1)
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David B. Fannin:Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3)/ Rule 32.1 Proceedings as to Daniel Miranda held on 3/20/2025 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Spanish Language Interpreter NOT required as to Daniel Miranda (Court Reporter FTR-PECOS.) (jh1)
Related: [-]
3 3 WAIVER - Rule 5/Rule 32.1 as to Daniel Miranda. (jh1)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER OF REMOVAL AND COMMITMENT TO ANOTHER DISTRICT as to Daniel Miranda. Defendant committed to the Northern District of California.. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (jh1)
Related: [-]
5 5 Notice to Northern District of California of a Rule 5, Rule 32, or Rule 40 Appearance as to Daniel Miranda. Your case number is: 3:23-CR-393. Docket sheet and documents attached. (If you require certified copies of any documents, please send a request to TXWD_ECF_help@txwd.uscourts.gov. If you wish to designate a different email address for future transfers, send your request to InterDistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov.) (jh1)
Related: [-]