Louisiana Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-00015
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2025
Terminated:Mar 11, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 3:15 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Spiro G. Latsis
U. S. Attorney'S Office (new Orleans)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Osman Gerardo Caballero-Funes (1)
Terminated: 03/11/2025
Represented By
Samuel John Scillitani, Jr.
Federal Public Defender (new Orleans)
contact info
Claude J. Kelly
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/22/2025 12:14 PM CDT
Thursday, February 20, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North as to Osman Gerardo Caballero-Funes (1). (mbb) (2CC USM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Magistrate Case Sheet