Michigan Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-20091
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 4:15 AM EDT
Defendant
Abhishek Jain (1)
Represented By
Sanford A. Schulman
contact info
Federal Community Defender
contact info
Defendant
Satwant Kaler (2)
Represented By
Federal Community Defender
contact info
David S. Steingold
Law Offices Of David S. Steingold, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Thomas Franzinger
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/22/2025 1:16 PM EDT
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT sworn before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford as to Satwant Singh Kaler (1), Abhishek Jain (2). (DPer) [2:24-mj-30533-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford: Initial Appearance as to Abhishek Jain held on 12/18/2024. Detention Hearing set for 12/20/2024 01:00 PM Disposition: Defendant temporarily detained. (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (Defendant Attorney: Rhonda Brazile) (AUSA: Sarah Alsaden) (DAll) [2:24-mj-30533-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford: Initial Appearance as to Satwant Singh Kaler held on 12/18/2024. Detention Hearing set for 12/20/2024 01:00 PM Disposition: Defendant temporarily detained. (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (Defendant Attorney: Rhonda Brazile) (AUSA: Sarah Alsaden) (DAll) [2:24-mj-30533-DUTY]
Related: [-]
5 5 Public Audio File of Initial Appearance as to Satwant Singh Kaler held on 12/18/2024 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. AUDIO FILE SIZE (1.9 MB) (MSyl) [2:24-mj-30533-DUTY]
Related: [-]
6 6 Public Audio File of Initial Appearance as to Abhishek Jain held on 12/18/2024 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. AUDIO FILE SIZE (1.0 MB) (MSyl) [2:24-mj-30533-DUTY]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDER as to Abhishek Jain. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (MCho) [2:24-mj-30533-DUTY]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDER as to Satwant Singh Kaler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (MCho) [2:24-mj-30533-DUTY]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER Regarding Brady Materials as to Abhishek Jain. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (MCho) [2:24-mj-30533-DUTY]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER Regarding Brady Materials as to Satwant Singh Kaler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (MCho) [2:24-mj-30533-DUTY]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER SCHEDULING A DETENTION HEARING AND FOR TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Abhishek Jain Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (MCho) [2:24-mj-30533-DUTY]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER SCHEDULING A DETENTION HEARING AND FOR TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Satwant Singh Kaler Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (MCho) [2:24-mj-30533-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE of CJA Attorney Appointment: Sanford A. Schulman has accepted the appointment to represent Abhishek Jain. (Carter, Michael) [2:24-mj-30533-DUTY]
Related: [-]
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE of CJA Attorney Appointment: David S. Steingold has accepted the appointment to represent Satwant Singh Kaler. (Carter, Michael) [2:24-mj-30533-DUTY]
Related: [-]
4 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David S. Steingold appearing for Satwant Singh Kaler . (Steingold, David) [2:24-mj-30533-DUTY]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sanford A. Schulman appearing for Abhishek Jain as appointed counsel pursuant to the Criminal Justice Act (CJA) (Schulman, Sanford) [2:24-mj-30533-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford: Detention Hearing Not Held as to Abhishek Jain.(Defendant Consents to Detention)(Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (Defendant Attorney: Sanford Schulman) (AUSA: Tom Franzinger) (DAll) [2:24-mj-30533-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford: Detention Hearing Not Held as to Satwant Singh Kaler. (Defendant Consents to Detention)(Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (Defendant Attorney: David Steingold) (AUSA: Tom Franzinger) (DAll) [2:24-mj-30533-DUTY]
Related: [-]
14 14 Public Audio File of Proceeding as to Abhishek Jain held on 12/20/2024 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. AUDIO FILE SIZE (1.6 MB) (MSyl) [2:24-mj-30533-DUTY]
Related: [-]
15 15 Public Audio File of Proceeding as to Satwant Singh Kaler held on 12/20/2024 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. AUDIO FILE SIZE (1.3 MB) (MSyl) [2:24-mj-30533-DUTY]
Related: [-]
17 17 NOTICE of Correction re 16 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Satwant Singh Kaler. (NAhm) [2:24-mj-30533-DUTY]
Related: [-]
18 18 CONSENT ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Abhishek Jain Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (NAhm) [2:24-mj-30533-DUTY]
Related: [-]
19 19 CONSENT ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Satwant Singh Kaler Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (NAhm) [2:24-mj-30533-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
20 20 Warrant for Arrest Returned Executed on 12/16/2024 as to Abhishek Jain. (TTho) [2:24-mj-30533-DUTY]
Related: [-]
21 21 Warrant for Arrest Returned Executed on 12/16/2024 as to Satwant Singh Kaler. (TTho) [2:24-mj-30533-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Abhishek Jain: Preliminary Examination set for 1/2/2025 at 01:00 PM. (DJen) [2:24-mj-30533-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Satwant Singh Kaler: Preliminary Examination set for 1/2/2025 at 01:00 PM. (DJen) [2:24-mj-30533-DUTY]
Related: [-]
22 22 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Satwant Singh Kaler, Abhishek Jain: Time excluded from 1/2/2025 until 1/23/2025. Preliminary Examination reset for 1/23/2025 at 01:00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman. (DJen) [2:24-mj-30533-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
23 23 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Satwant Singh Kaler, Abhishek Jain Time excluded from 1/23/2025 until 2/7/2025. Preliminary Examination set for 2/7/2025 01:00 PM Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (DAll) [2:24-mj-30533-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
24 24 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Satwant Singh Kaler, Abhishek Jain Time excluded from 2/7/2025 until 2/21/2025. Preliminary Examination adjourned to 2/21/2025 01:00 PM Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut) [2:24-mj-30533-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
25 25 INDICTMENT as to Abhishek Jain (1) count(s) 1, 2, Satwant Kaler (2) count(s) 1, 2. (JHea)
Related: [-]