Case Filed:Feb 20, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 3:27 AM EDT
Defendant
Jordan Marquis Cantrell (1)
Represented By
Mary Ellen Coleman
Fed. Defenders Of Western Nc
contact info
Defendant
Titus Jerome Twitty (2)
Represented By
John Pritchard
The Pritchard Firm, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Christopher S. Hess
U.S. Attorney'S Office--Wdnc
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/27/2025 8:34 AM EDT
Thursday, February 20, 2025
Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence (3:24-mc-104). Click on this link to retrieve the Standing Order (mga)
Related: [-]
1 1 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Jordan Marquis Cantrell, Titus Jerome Twitty. (mga)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER granting 1 Motion to Seal Case as to Jordan Marquis Cantrell (1), Titus Jerome Twitty (2). Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/20/25. (mga)
Related: [-]
3 3 8 pgs INDICTMENT as to Jordan Marquis Cantrell (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4-5, 6-8, Titus Jerome Twitty (2) count(s) 1, 6-8. (mga) (Attachment 3 replaced on 3/3/2025) (brl). (Attachment 4 replaced on 3/3/2025) (brl). Modified pursuant to7 Order on 3/19/2025 (slm).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted Signature Page,
Att: 2 Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Cantrell Penalty Sheet,
Att: 4 Twitty Penalty Sheet
4 4 Arrest Warrant Issued (Sealed - Case Participants) in case as to Jordan Marquis Cantrell.(mga)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Warrant Page Identifier
5 5 Arrest Warrant Issued (Sealed - Case Participants) in case as to Titus Jerome Twitty.(mga)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Warrant Page Identifier