New Mexico District Court
Judge:Kevin R Sweazea
Referred: Steven C Yarbrough
Case #: 1:25-cv-00296
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Mar 23, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 24, 2025 1:01 AM MDT
Defendant
John Doe 1
Defendant
John Doe 2
Defendant
Rationalwiki Foundation, Inc.
122 Girard Ave NE
Albuquerque, NM 87106
Defendant
Trent Toulouse
8715 Opportunity Dr NE
Albuquerque, NM 87109
Defendant
Larry Will
Petitioner
Michael Woodley of Menie
Represented By
Aaron Cress
Late Night Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
6 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Michael Woodley of Menie (Cress, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
5 5 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re4 Summons Returned Executed by Michael Woodley of Menie (Cress, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
4 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Woodley of Menie. Rationalwiki Foundation, Inc. served on 4/2/2025, answer due 4/23/2025. (Cress, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Summons Issued as to John Doe 1, Trent Toulouse, Larry Will. (jg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
Summons Issued as to Rationalwiki Foundation, Inc.. (dr)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (bc)
Related: [-]
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 23, 2025
1 1 25 pgs COMPLAINT Verified Complaint for Damages against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Michael Woodley of Menie.(Cress, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number ANMDC-9848111 (fs)
Related: [-]