Washington Western District Court
Judge:Benjamin H Settle
Case #: 3:25-cv-05251
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Mar 23, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 5:19 AM PDT
Defendant
Eric Eugene Crowl
E-Filing/Service 10002 112TH ST SW
LAKEWOOD, WA 98498
Defendant
Pierce County Republican Party
Defendant
Washington47 PAC
Plaintiff
Pierce County Republican Party
Represented By
Conner Edwards
Cg Edwards PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
utility Terminate Motions (Public) Mon 04/21 9:57 AM
***Motion terminated:18 MOTION for Extension of Time AND CLARIFICATION REGARDING SERVICE OF AMENDED COMPLAINT and14 MOTION to Quash SERVICE OF PROCESS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS FOR INSUFFICIENT SERVICE OF PROCESS filed by Eric Eugene Crowl. Motions terminated re Dkt.23 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANT ERIC CROWLS MOTIONS (1) MOTION TO QUASH OR DISMISS (2) MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION; AND EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND. (MDH)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
25 25 service Summons Issued Fri 04/18 2:42 PM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Eric Eugene Crowl, Pierce County Republican Party, Washington47 PAC. (MDH)
Related: [-]
24 24 order BHS - Discovery, Depositions, and JSR Order (FORM) Fri 04/18 8:35 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/3/2025, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/10/2025, Joint Status Report due by 7/17/2025. (MET)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
23 23 notice Notice-Other Thu 04/17 2:30 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANT ERIC CROWLS MOTIONS (1) MOTION TO QUASH OR DISMISS (2) MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION; AND EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND ; filed by Defendant Eric Eugene Crowl. (Crowl, Eric)
Related: [-]
22 22 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 04/17 2:03 PM
MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to Judge Benjamin H. Settle for all further proceedings. Hon. S. Kate Vaughan no longer assigned to case. (SNP)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Letter Thu 04/17 11:35 AM
LETTER filed by Defendants Pierce County Republican Party and Washington47 PAC. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
20 20 respm Response to Motion Mon 04/14 8:22 PM
RESPONSE, by All Plaintiffs, to18 MOTION for Extension of Time AND CLARIFICATION REGARDING SERVICE OF AMENDED COMPLAINT . (Edwards, Conner)
Related: [-]
19 19 respm Response to Motion Mon 04/14 4:06 PM
RESPONSE, by All Plaintiffs, to14 MOTION to Quash SERVICE OF PROCESS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS FOR INSUFFICIENT SERVICE OF PROCESS .(Edwards, Conner)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Robert Parker
Sunday, April 13, 2025
18 18 motion Extension of Time-Other Sun 04/13 1:52 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time AND CLARIFICATION REGARDING SERVICE OF AMENDED COMPLAINT , filed by Defendant Eric Eugene Crowl. Noting Date 5/5/2025, (Crowl, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ERIC CROWLS MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION REGARDING SERVICE OF AMENDED COMPLAINT AND FOR EXTENSION OF RESPONSE DEADLINE
Saturday, April 12, 2025
17 17 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Sat 04/12 8:12 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Edwards, Conner)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Praecipe for a Summons Sat 04/12 7:58 PM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS TO DEFENDANTS by All Plaintiffs (Edwards, Conner)
Related: [-]
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint Sat 04/12 7:51 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Pierce County Republican Party.(Edwards, Conner)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Quash Sat 04/12 12:31 PM
MOTION to Quash SERVICE OF PROCESS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS FOR INSUFFICIENT SERVICE OF PROCESS , filed by Defendant Eric Eugene Crowl. Noting Date 5/28/2025, (Crowl, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ERIC CROWLS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS FOR INSUFFICIENT SERVICE OF PROCESS
13 13 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Sat 04/12 11:30 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Eric Crowl (individual), Washington47 PAC (nonprofit corporation), Pierce County Republican Party (nonprofit corporation) on 3/24/2025, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Edwards, Conner)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
12 12 notice Notice-Other Fri 04/11 3:48 PM
NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO POTENTIAL CONFLICT OF INTEREST ; filed by Defendant Eric Eugene Crowl. (Crowl, Eric)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice-Other Fri 04/11 11:13 AM
NOTICE TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS FOR INSUFFICIENT SERVICE OF PROCESS (ADDITIONAL EXHIBITS) ; filed by Defendant Eric Eugene Crowl. (Crowl, Eric)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
10 10 notice Notice-Other Thu 04/10 11:37 PM
NOTICE OF FORTHCOMING MOTION REGARDING MATTERS OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; AND SPECIAL APPEARANCE ; filed by Defendant Eric Eugene Crowl. (Crowl, Eric)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
9 9 notice Notice-Other Wed 04/09 11:47 AM
NOTICE OF RECORD ERRORS ; filed by Defendant Eric Eugene Crowl. (Crowl, Eric)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
8 8 notice Notice re Pro Se Registration Thu 04/03 10:47 AM
NOTICE: Defendant Eric Eugene Crowl has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. The party was directed to enter their appearance in accordance with LCR 83.2. (KB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
7 7 utility Report Regarding Patent/Trademark/Copyright Wed 03/26 4:11 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Report not applicable. (CJS)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice-Other Wed 03/26 1:22 PM
NOTICE Form AO-120 ; filed by All Plaintiffs. (Edwards, Conner)
Related: [-]
5 5 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Wed 03/26 12:35 PM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** Copyright/Patent/Trademark Forms Omitted. See attached letter for more information and instructions. (CDA)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 03/24 11:31 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET; filed by Plaintiff Pierce County Republican Party. (Edwards, Conner)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 03/24 10:10 AM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Eric Crowl, Pierce County Republican Party, Washington47 PAC. (CJS)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Mon 03/24 10:02 AM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** Civil Cover Sheet Omitted. See attached letter for more information and instructions. (CJS)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 03/24 10:07 AM
Hon. S. Kate Vaughan added. (CJS)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 23, 2025
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Sun 03/23 8:03 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Related [+] Attorney Conner Edwards added to party Pierce County Republican Party(pty:pla) filed by Pierce County Republican Party.(Edwards, Conner)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8895861
Att: 1 Summons Summons