Gonzalez v. Los Ranchos of Bayside, Inc, et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodolfo A Ruiz, II |
Case #: | 1:25-cv-21334 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2025 |
Terminated: | Apr 23, 2025 |
Last checked: Thursday May 08, 2025 4:25 AM EDT |
Defendant
Los Ranchos of Bayside, Inc,
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Skyy Properties, Inc,
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jesus Gonzalez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Thursday, May 08, 2025 | ||
20 | 20
![]() NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jorge Luis Fors on behalf of Skyy Properties, Inc,. Attorney Jorge Luis Fors added to party Skyy Properties, Inc,(pty:dft). (Fors, Jorge) |
|
Wednesday, April 23, 2025 | ||
19 | 19
![]() ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 4/23/2025. See attached document for full details. (jgz) |
|
18 | 18
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 04/23 1:30 PM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II: Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/23/2025. Order to follow. Attorney Appearance(s): Juan Courtney Cunningham, Todd William Shulby, Court Reporter: Ilona Lupowitz, 305-523-5737 / Ilona_lupowitz@flsd.uscourts.gov. (gp) |
|
Friday, April 18, 2025 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Los Ranchos of Bayside, Inc, (Shulby, Todd) |
|
16 | 16
![]() Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Los Ranchos of Bayside, Inc, (Shulby, Todd) |
|
15 | 15
![]() ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Los Ranchos of Bayside, Inc,. (Shulby, Todd) |
|
14 | 14
![]() NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd William Shulby on behalf of Los Ranchos of Bayside, Inc,. Attorney Todd William Shulby added to party Los Ranchos of Bayside, Inc,(pty:dft). (Shulby, Todd) |
|
Thursday, April 17, 2025 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order Setting Status Conference
Thu 04/17 8:21 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER setting telephonic status conference for Wednesday, April 23, 2025, at 1:00 P.M. The parties are instructed to call +1 833-568-8864 by no later than 12:55 P.M. The phone conference ID is 160 623 6605 and the password is 304850. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 4/17/2025. (jgz) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Thu 04/17 6:53 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting11 Defendant Skyy Properties, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall submit a single combined response or separate answers to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before May 12, 2025 . Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 4/17/2025. (jgz) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to file a response to complaint re1 Complaint by Skyy Properties, Inc,. Responses due by 5/1/2025.(Bandklayder, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Keith Bandklayder on behalf of Skyy Properties, Inc,. Attorney Daniel Keith Bandklayder added to party Skyy Properties, Inc,(pty:dft). (Bandklayder, Daniel) |
|
utility
~Util - Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline
Mon 04/21 3:30 PM
Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline per DE 12 Order. Skyy Properties, Inc, response/answer due 5/12/2025. (amb) |
||
Tuesday, April 08, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of filing a Verified Affidavit Supporting Plaintiff's Standing by Jesus Gonzalez re4 Order, (Cunningham, Juan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
8 | 8
![]() CERTIFICATE of Counsel re4 Order, by Juan Courtney Cunningham on behalf of Jesus Gonzalez (Cunningham, Juan) |
|
Tuesday, April 01, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() ORDER REQUIRING COMBINED RESPONSES. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 4/1/2025. See attached document for full details. (jgz) |
|
6 | 6
![]() SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Jesus Gonzalez. Skyy Properties, Inc, served on 3/31/2025, response/answer due 4/21/2025. (Cunningham, Juan) |
|
5 | 5
![]() SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Jesus Gonzalez. Los Ranchos of Bayside, Inc, served on 3/28/2025, response/answer due 4/18/2025. (Cunningham, Juan) |
|
Tuesday, March 25, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() ORDER REQUIRING VERIFIED CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL REGARDING ANY PRIOR FILINGS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT AND VERIFIED AFFIDAVIT REGARDING VISITS TO PROPERTY. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II, on 3/24/2025. See attached document for full details. (caw) |
|
Monday, March 24, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued as to Los Ranchos of Bayside, Inc,, Skyy Properties, Inc,. (cwc) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 03/24 10:19 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cwc) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18306562, filed by Jesus Gonzalez.(Cunningham, Juan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |