Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10964

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Martin Glenn
Case #: 1:25-ap-01045
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2025
Terminated:May 06, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Chainalysis, Inc.
Represented By
Chainalysis, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Celsius Network LLC and affiliated post-Effective Date Debtors, by and through the Blockchain Recovery Investment Consortium, LLC, acting in its capacity as the Complex Asset Recovery Manager and Liti
Represented By
Jeffrey S. Sabin
Venable LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Tue 05/06 10:07 AM
Adversary Case 1:25-ap-1045 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
19 19 6 pgs order Order of U.S. District Court Judge Thu 04/17 11:46 AM
Copy of Order of U.S. District Court Judge Margaret M. Garnett signed on 4/8/2025 Granting Motion to Withdraw the Reference. Related [+] (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 14
Monday, March 31, 2025
18 18 misc Certificate of Service Mon 03/31 8:21 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Alex Drylewski on behalf of Chainalysis, Inc.. (Drylewski, Alex)
Related: [-] 14 ,15 ,16
17 17 appeal Civil Cover Sheet Mon 03/31 5:55 PM
Civil Cover Sheet from U.S. District Court, Case Number: 25-cv-2669 Judge Margaret M. Garnett Related [+] (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 14
16 16 2 pgs answer Declaration Mon 03/31 4:34 PM
Declaration of Alexander C. Drylewski in Support of Motion to Withdraw the Reference Related [+] filed by Alex Drylewski on behalf of Chainalysis, Inc.. (Drylewski, Alex)
Related: [-] 14
Att: 1 59 pgs Exhibit 1 - Complaint
Att: 2 6 pgs Exhibit 2 - Proof of Claim
15 15 16 pgs answer Memorandum of Law Mon 03/31 4:27 PM
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Withdraw the Reference Related [+] filed by Alex Drylewski on behalf of Chainalysis, Inc.. (Drylewski, Alex)
Related: [-] 14
14 14 motion Motion, Withdraw the Reference (fee) Mon 03/31 4:13 PM
Motion to Withdraw the Reference filed by Alex Drylewski on behalf of Chainalysis, Inc.. (Drylewski, Alex)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
13 13 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Mon 03/31 3:28 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement . Filed by Alex Drylewski on behalf of Chainalysis, Inc.. (Drylewski, Alex)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Mon 03/31 3:22 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding and Request for Service of Papers filed by Lara A. Flath on behalf of Chainalysis, Inc.. (Flath, Lara)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Mon 03/31 3:19 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding and Request for Service of Papers filed by Alex Drylewski on behalf of Chainalysis, Inc.. (Drylewski, Alex)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Mon 03/31 3:14 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding and Request for Service of Papers filed by Robert Drain on behalf of Chainalysis, Inc.. (Drain, Robert)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Mon 03/31 4:16 PM
Receipt of Motion to Withdraw the Reference (fee)([LINK 25-01045 mg] ) [motion,205] ( 199.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A17020849. Fee amount 199.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #14
Friday, March 28, 2025
9 9 order Application, Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/28 9:06 AM
Order, Signed on 3/28/2025, Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Charles Garabedian Related [+]. (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 6
8 8 order Application, Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/28 9:02 AM
Order, Signed on 3/28/2025, Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Joshua Migdal Related [+]. (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 5
7 7 order Application, Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/28 8:57 AM
Order, Signed on 3/28/2025, Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Daija P. Lifshitz Related [+]. (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 4
Thursday, March 27, 2025
6 6 motion Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission Thu 03/27 4:19 PM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission (Charles Garabedian) filed by Jeffrey S. Sabin on behalf of Celsius Network LLC and affiliated post-Effective Date Debtors, by and through the Blockchain Recovery Investment Consortium, LLC, acting in its capacity as the Complex Asset Recovery Manager and Liti. (Sabin, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
5 5 motion Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission Thu 03/27 4:15 PM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission (Joshua Migdal) filed by Jeffrey S. Sabin on behalf of Celsius Network LLC and affiliated post-Effective Date Debtors, by and through the Blockchain Recovery Investment Consortium, LLC, acting in its capacity as the Complex Asset Recovery Manager and Liti. (Sabin, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
4 4 motion Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission Thu 03/27 4:10 PM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission (Daija P. Lifshitz) filed by Jeffrey S. Sabin on behalf of Celsius Network LLC and affiliated post-Effective Date Debtors, by and through the Blockchain Recovery Investment Consortium, LLC, acting in its capacity as the Complex Asset Recovery Manager and Liti. (Sabin, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
3 3 notice Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Thu 03/27 4:06 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding / Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers filed by Jeffrey S. Sabin on behalf of Celsius Network LLC and affiliated post-Effective Date Debtors, by and through the Blockchain Recovery Investment Consortium, LLC, acting in its capacity as the Complex Asset Recovery Manager and Liti. (Sabin, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Thu 03/27 4:12 PM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission([LINK 25-01045 mg] ) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A17017030. Fee amount 200.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #4
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Thu 03/27 4:17 PM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission([LINK 25-01045 mg] ) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A17017048. Fee amount 200.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #5
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Thu 03/27 4:22 PM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission([LINK 25-01045 mg] ) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A17017059. Fee amount 200.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #6
Monday, March 24, 2025
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Mon 03/24 3:00 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/30/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG), Answer due by 4/23/2025, (Ramos, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 22, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Sat 03/22 6:19 PM
Adversary case 25-01045 Complaint against Chainalysis, Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Jeffrey S. Sabin on behalf of Celsius Network LLC and affiliated post-Effective Date Debtors, by and through the Blockchain Recovery Investment Consortium, LLC, acting in its capacity as the Complex Asset Recovery Manager and Liti. (Sabin, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A