California Central District Court
Judge:Monica Ramirez Almadani
Referred: Charles F Eick
Case #: 2:25-cv-02550
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 08, 2025 1:20 AM PDT
Defendant
Sterling Infosystems, Inc.
Represented By
Andrew A Wood
Allen Matkins Leck Gabmle Mallory And Natsis LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael OHalloran Bugarin
Represented By
Andrew Joseph Gramajo
Ajg Law Group, PC
contact info
Karen Thomas Stefano
Consumer Attorneys PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 15, 2025
16 16 notice Clerical Error (G-11) Thu 05/15 6:41 PM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR:Text Only Entry. Due to a clerical error, the case was assigned to Magistrate Judge John D. Early. The case is returned for random reassignment to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick for all further proceedings. The case will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:25-cv-02550-MRA-Ex.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (nhac)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 05/09 11:58 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 and Affirmative Defenses filed by Defendant Sterling Infosystems, Inc..(Wood, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
14 14 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 05/02 11:48 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant All Defendants, identifying Sterling Check Corp. and First Advantage Corporation. (Wood, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
13 13 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 04/16 10:31 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Sterling Infosystems, Inc. answer now due 5/9/2025, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Sterling Infosystems, Inc..(Attorney Andrew A Wood added to party Sterling Infosystems, Inc.(pty:dft))(Wood, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
12 12 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Wed 04/02 12:50 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Application for Substitution of Attorney G-01. Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. Other error(s) with document(s): Form G-01. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 04/02 12:49 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michael OHalloran Bugarin, upon Defendant Sterling Infosystems, Inc. served on 3/28/2025, answer due 4/18/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Roslynne Vang, SOP Specialist in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed (Gramajo, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Thu 03/27 11:08 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Karen Thomas Stefano counsel for Plaintiff Michael OHalloran Bugarin. Karen Thomas Stefano is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Karen Thomas Stefano. (Stefano, Karen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 03/26 2:02 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Andrew Joseph Gramajo counsel for Plaintiff Michael OHalloran Bugarin. Adding Andrew J. Gramajo as counsel of record for Plaintiff Michael O'Halloran Bugarin for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Andrew J. Gramajo. (Attorney Andrew Joseph Gramajo added to party Michael OHalloran Bugarin(pty:pla))(Gramajo, Andrew)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 03/26 12:06 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Sterling Infosystems, Inc. (lh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 03/26 12:03 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 03/26 12:02 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 03/26 12:02 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (lh)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
4 4 notice Summons Request Mon 03/24 10:38 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Michael O'Halloran Bugarin. (Thomas, Karen)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 03/24 10:35 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Michael O'Halloran Bugarin, (Thomas, Karen)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 03/24 10:26 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Michael O'Halloran Bugarin. (Thomas, Karen)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/24 10:23 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39359945 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Michael O'Halloran Bugarin. (Attorney Karen Leslie Thomas added to party Michael O'Halloran Bugarin(pty:pla))(Thomas, Karen)
Related: [-]