Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:24-bk-01387

Iowa Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lee M Jackwig
Case #: 4:25-ap-30010
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Daniel Eric Pettit
1265 Salm Drive
North Liberty, IA 52317
Represented By
Daniel Eric Pettit
contact info
Plaintiff
Meadows Capital Partners I, LLC
Represented By
Robert C Gainer
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/25 6:39 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Daniel Eric Pettit. (Morse, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/25 2:06 PM
Error: Incorrect Main Case Number and Adversary Case Number. Answer to Complaint Filed by Daniel Eric Pettit. (Morse, David)Modified on 3/25/2025 (ccc)
Related: [-]
court Corrective Entry Tue 03/25 3:57 PM
Corrective Entry Incorrect Main Case Number and Adversary Case Number. Related [+](ccc)
Related: [-] 4 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Daniel Eric Pettit
Monday, March 24, 2025
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 03/24 3:10 PM
Summons Service Executed On Daniel Eric Pettit 3/24/2025 (Gainer, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
2 2 court Summons and Notice Issued Fri 03/21 4:30 PM
Summons and Notice Issued on Daniel Eric Pettit Answer Due 04/20/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 05/21/2025 at 09:00 AM at US Bk Ct, 4th Floor, Courtroom 430. (ajmk)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/21 3:41 PM
Adversary case 25-30010 Complaint by Meadows Capital Partners I, LLC against Daniel Eric Pettit. Fee Amount $350 (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))),(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) Lead Case No. 4:24-bk-1387 (Gainer, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet