New Jersey District Court
Judge:Madeline Cox Arleo
Referred: Andre M Espinosa
Case #: 2:25-cv-02048
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 08, 2025 4:38 AM EDT
Defendant
ROBERT MIRAGLIOTTA
Defendant
MUNICIPAL VENDOR SERVICES, INC.
Defendant
MARCUM LLP (nka CBIZ)
Defendant
GOVERNMENT FINANCE & SERVICES, INC.
Defendant
FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP
Defendant
CELERAFI CORP.
Defendant
BENESCH FRIEDLANDER COPLAN & ARONOFF, LLP
Defendant
MICHAEL J. BARRIE
Defendant
LACARYA SCOTT
Defendant
BRAY BARNES
Defendant
PETER MCGUIRE
Defendant
JAMES MCCARTHY
Defendant
SCOTT HOSPES
Defendant
THEODORE ELLENIS
Defendant
SCOTT CHILSON
Defendant
HARRY CHARNLEY
Defendant
JASON BODNICK
Defendant
JEMAL BEALE
Defendant
CRAIG BARTLETT
Plaintiff
DISCOVER GROWTH FUND II, LLC
Represented By
DALE EDWARD BARNEY
Gibbons, PC
contact info
MARK A. BERMAN
Hartmann Doherty Rosa Berman & Bulbulia, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
9 9 service Summons Issued Thu 05/08 3:14 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to BRAY BARNES, MICHAEL J. BARRIE, CRAIG BARTLETT, JEMAL BEALE, BENESCH FRIEDLANDER COPLAN & ARONOFF, LLP, JASON BODNICK, CELERAFI CORP., HARRY CHARNLEY, SCOTT CHILSON, THEODORE ELLENIS, FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP, GOVERNMENT FINANCE & SERVICES, INC., SCOTT HOSPES, MARCUM LLP (nka CBIZ), JAMES MCCARTHY, PETER MCGUIRE, ROBERT MIRAGLIOTTA, MUNICIPAL VENDOR SERVICES, INC., LACARYA SCOTT. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Letter Thu 05/08 7:24 AM
Letter from Mark A. Berman, Esq. Related [+] re7 Amended Complaint,,. (BERMAN, MARK)
Related: [-] questing issuance of Summons to serve Amended Complaint
Friday, April 18, 2025
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 04/18 2:16 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against BRAY BARNES, CRAIG BARTLETT, JEMAL BEALE, JASON BODNICK, HARRY CHARNLEY, SCOTT CHILSON, THEODORE ELLENIS, SCOTT HOSPES, JAMES MCCARTHY, PETER MCGUIRE, ROBERT MIRAGLIOTTA, LACARYA SCOTT, MUNICIPAL VENDOR SERVICES, INC., GOVERNMENT FINANCE & SERVICES, INC., CELERAFI CORP., MICHAEL J. BARRIE, BENESCH FRIEDLANDER COPLAN & ARONOFF, LLP, FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP, MARCUM LLP (nka CBIZ), filed by DISCOVER GROWTH FUND II, LLC.(BERMAN, MARK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit 1,
Att: 11 Exhibit 2,
Att: 12 Exhibit 3,
Att: 13 Exhibit 4
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
6 6 misc Substitution of Attorney Wed 04/16 3:06 PM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney DALE EDWARD BARNEY terminated. Attorney MARK A. BERMAN for DISCOVER GROWTH FUND II, LLC added.. (BERMAN, MARK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/10 12:27 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DISCOVER GROWTH FUND II, LLC. CRAIG BARTLETT waiver sent on 3/27/2025, answer due 5/27/2025. (BARNEY, DALE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
4 4 misc Exhibit (to Document) Tue 04/08 1:46 PM
Exhibit to1 Complaint,, Exhibit I, by DISCOVER GROWTH FUND II, LLC. (BARNEY, DALE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 03/25 2:24 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to BRAY BARNES, CRAIG BARTLETT, JEMAL BEALE, JASON BODNICK, HARRY CHARNLEY, SCOTT CHILSON, THEODORE ELLENIS, SCOTT HOSPES, JAMES MCCARTHY, PETER MCGUIRE, ROBERT MIRAGLIOTTA, LACARYA SCOTT. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (and)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 03/25 11:46 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. (mfr)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Mon 03/24 4:23 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by DISCOVER GROWTH FUND II, LLC identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (BARNEY, DALE)
Related: [-]
1 1 59 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 03/24 4:20 PM
COMPLAINT against BRAY BARNES, CRAIG BARTLETT, JEMAL BEALE, JASON BODNICK, HARRY CHARNLEY, SCOTT CHILSON, THEODORE ELLENIS, SCOTT HOSPES, JAMES MCCARTHY, PETER MCGUIRE, ROBERT MIRAGLIOTTA, LACARYA SCOTT ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-16114553) with JURY DEMAND, filed by DISCOVER GROWTH FUND II, LLC.(BARNEY, DALE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 10 Certification Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 11.2,
Att: 11 Certification Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 201.1