Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Michael R Barrett
Case #: 1:25-cv-00187
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2025
Terminated:Apr 01, 2025
Case in other court:Warren County, Ohio Court of Common Pleas, 2025 CVH 00268
Last checked: Thursday May 08, 2025 4:43 AM EDT
Defendant
Nestle Purina Petcare Company
Represented By
Cassandra L. Welch
Stites & Harbison, PLLC
contact info
William G Geisen
Stites & Harbison
contact info
Plaintiff
Concrete Recovery LLC
150 East Forst Avenue
South Lebanon, OH 45065
Represented By
Nathan Michael Rhodes
Sebaly Shillito & Dyer
contact info
Toby K Henderson
Toby K. Henderson
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
6 6 order Judgment - Clerk Tue 04/01 3:18 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT per4 Order signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 4/1/2025. (kkz)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/01 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Remand to Clermont County Court of Common Pleas, Ohio. (kkz)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Tue 04/01 3:15 PM
ORDER remanding this civil action to the Court of Common Pleas for Clermont County, Ohio. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 4/1/2025. (kkz)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Document Mon 03/31 2:12 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Defendant Nestle Purina Petcare Company re1 Notice of Removal,, (Welch, Cassandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
2 2 cmp Complaint Tue 03/25 8:23 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND originally filed on 2/12/2025 in Clermont County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. 2025CVH268) against Nestle Purina PetCare Company by Concrete Recovery LLC. (jmt)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Tue 03/25 8:25 AM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (jmt)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 03/24 4:56 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Warren County, Ohio Court of Common Pleas, case number 2025 CVH 00268 ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10433237), filed by Nestle Purina Pet Care Company. (Welch, Cassandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2-Missouri SOS Records,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3-Demand Letter,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4-3-17-25 Email Exchange,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Cover Sheet