Arkansas Western District Court
Judge:Christy D Comstock
Case #: 5:25-cv-05066
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2025
Case in other court:Benton County Circuit Court, 04CV-25-00708
Last checked: Thursday May 08, 2025 3:17 AM CDT
Defendant
B&B Land Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Alec Martinez
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Jason C. Smith
Spencer Fane Britt & Browne LLP
contact info
Ward Douglas Reynolds
Spencer Fane
contact info
Defendant
Marck Industries of Northwest Arkansas, LLC
Represented By
Alec Martinez
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Jason C. Smith
Spencer Fane Britt & Browne LLP
contact info
Ward Douglas Reynolds
Spencer Fane
contact info
Defendant
Marck Industries, Inc.
Represented By
Alec Martinez
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Jason C. Smith
Spencer Fane Britt & Browne LLP
contact info
Ward Douglas Reynolds
Spencer Fane
contact info
Plaintiff
Rogers Arkansas, City of
Represented By
John M. Pesek
City Of Rogers, Arkansas
contact info
John Michael Pesek
City Of Rogers
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
22 22 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 05/12 11:55 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re8 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted filed by B&B Land Holdings, LLC, Marck Industries of Northwest Arkansas, LLC, Marck Industries, Inc.. (Martinez, Alec)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
21 21 order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Order Mon 05/05 9:49 AM
TEXT ONLY Cancelling Case Management Hearing set for 5/29/2025 10:00 AM. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on May 5, 2025. (rg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
20 20 order Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Tue 04/29 12:37 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge per Text Only Order 19 . Case reassigned to Honorable Christy D. Comstock. (tmc)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Order Tue 04/29 12:06 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to refer this case to Magistrate Judge Christy D. Comstock pursuant to the parties' Joint 26f Report. See Doc. 17, page 5, paragraph 12, indicating that the parties consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 29, 2025. (slc)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Protective Order Tue 04/29 11:53 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 29, 2025. (tmc)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Tue 04/29 11:15 AM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by B&B Land Holdings, LLC, Marck Industries of Northwest Arkansas, LLC, Marck Industries, Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] ynolds, Ward
Thursday, April 17, 2025
16 16 service Affidavit of Service Thu 04/17 2:17 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons, filed by Rogers Arkansas, City of. All Defendants.(Pesek, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
15 15 order Order on Motion for Leave Thu 04/17 6:34 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING14 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 17, 2025. (slc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
14 14 motion Leave Wed 04/16 5:50 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by B&B Land Holdings, LLC, Marck Industries of Northwest Arkansas, LLC, Marck Industries, Inc..(Martinez, Alec)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: Proposed Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss
Friday, April 11, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/11 9:26 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ward Douglas Reynolds on behalf of All Defendants. Related [+]
Related: [-] ynolds, Ward
Friday, April 04, 2025
12 12 respm Response to Motion Fri 04/04 3:45 PM
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re8 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted filed by Rogers Arkansas, City of. (Pesek, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
11 11 order Initial Scheduling Order Wed 04/02 11:18 AM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 5/29/2025 10:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/8/2025. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 2, 2025. (slc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
notice Clerk's Notice Regarding Attorney Registration Wed 03/26 9:15 AM
TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE: The following attorney listed on Notice of Removal,2 is not registered for CM/ECF noticing and filing in the Western District of Arkansas: W. Doug Reynolds . An attorney can register through PACER for a CM/ECF login and password if they are admitted to practice in the U.S. District Courts for the Eastern and Western Districts of Arkansas or are admitted pro hac vice for this case. Any non-registered attorney should submit the proper attorney admission petition or file an appropriate motion. Please refer to our website http://www.arwd.uscourts.gov/attorney-information for further information.(mll)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
misc Filing Fee Submitted Tue 03/25 2:34 PM
Notice of Removal filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 405, receipt number AARWDC-3154845.. (Smith, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/24 5:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alec Martinez on behalf of B&B Land Holdings, LLC, Marck Industries of Northwest Arkansas, LLC, Marck Industries, Inc.. (Martinez, Alec)
Related: [-]
9 9 13 pgs msupport Memorandum Brief in Support Mon 03/24 5:20 PM
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of8 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted by B&B Land Holdings, LLC, Marck Industries of Northwest Arkansas, LLC, Marck Industries, Inc.. (Smith, Jason)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Dismiss Case Mon 03/24 5:15 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted by B&B Land Holdings, LLC, Marck Industries of Northwest Arkansas, LLC, Marck Industries, Inc.. (Smith, Jason)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement - Filed by Attorney Mon 03/24 5:07 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by B&B Land Holdings, LLC. (Smith, Jason)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement - Filed by Attorney Mon 03/24 5:04 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marck Industries of Northwest Arkansas, LLC. (Smith, Jason)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement - Filed by Attorney Mon 03/24 5:04 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marck Industries, Inc.. (Smith, Jason)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Magistrate Notice/Consent Form Mon 03/24 3:59 PM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form.(mll)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Complaint Mon 03/24 3:56 PM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against B&B Land Holdings, LLC, Marck Industries of Northwest Arkansas, LLC, Marck Industries, Inc. filed by Rogers Arkansas, City of.(mll)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 03/24 3:50 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Benton County, Arkansas, case number 04CV-25-708 filed by Marck Industries, Inc., B&B Land Holdings, LLC, Marck Industries of Northwest Arkansas, LLC.(mll)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex. A,
Att: 2 Ex. B,
Att: 3 Ex. C
1 1 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 03/24 3:47 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by B&B Land Holdings, LLC, Marck Industries of Northwest Arkansas, LLC, Marck Industries, Inc.(mll)
Related: [-]
notice Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee Mon 03/24 4:01 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee:2 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $405.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days. If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal. Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 3/26/2025.(mll)
Related: [-]
notice Clerk's Notice re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading Mon 03/24 4:07 PM
TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Defendants B&B Land Holdings, LLC, Marck Industries of Northwest Arkansas, LLC, Marck Industries, Inc. Notice of Removal,2 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorneys, who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Alec M. Martinez, W. Doug Reynolds .(mll)
Related: [-]