District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Jia M Cobb
Case #: 1:25-cv-00872
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause8:1101 Immigration and Nationality Act
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 24, 2025 6:06 PM EDT
Defendant
PETE R. FLORES
Defendant
TODD LYONS
Defendant
SECRETARY KRISTI NOEM
Defendant
KIKA SCOTT
Defendant
DONALD J. TRUMP
Plaintiff
CASA, INC.
Represented By
Esther H. Sung
Justice Action Center
contact info
Plaintiff
COALITION FOR HUMANE IMMIGRANT RIGHTS OF LOS ANGELES
Represented By
Esther H. Sung
Justice Action Center
contact info
Plaintiff
UNDOCUBLACK NETWORK
Represented By
Esther H. Sung
Justice Action Center
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/05 4:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Hillary Li on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Li, Hillary)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance- Pro Bono Mon 04/28 10:29 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Bergquist on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bergquist, Carl) Modified on 4/28/2025 (zdp)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/25 6:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Papu Sandhu on behalf of All Defendants (Sandhu, Papu)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/24 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Charles Katz on behalf of CASA, INC. (Katz, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/23 5:08 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Attorney Carl Bergquist is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on April 23, 2025. (lcjmc1)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/23 5:13 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Attorney Nicholas Katz is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on April 23, 2025. (lcjmc1)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/14 3:30 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- NICHOLAS KATZ, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11613955. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CASA, INC., COALITION FOR HUMANE IMMIGRANT RIGHTS, UNDOCUBLACK NETWORK.(Sung, Esther)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Attorney Declaration,
Att: 2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/14 3:26 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Carl Bergquist, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11613907. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CASA, INC., COALITION FOR HUMANE IMMIGRANT RIGHTS, UNDOCUBLACK NETWORK.(Sung, Esther)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Attorney Declaration,
Att: 2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Mon 04/14 11:57 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/31/2025. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/30/2025. (Sung, Esther)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Mon 04/14 11:53 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TODD LYONS served on 3/31/2025 (Sung, Esther)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
notice Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status Fri 03/28 9:05 AM
NOTICE of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status re7 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen C. Tumlin on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tumlin, Karen). Your attorney renewal/government certification has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 4/4/2025. (zapb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/27 10:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Karen C. Tumlin on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tumlin, Karen)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/27 12:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Esther H. Sung on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sung, Esther)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
5 5 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Tue 03/25 11:30 AM
SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(zdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
4 4 cmp Request for Summons to Issue Tue 03/25 11:01 AM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by CASA, INC., UNDOCUBLACK NETWORK, COALITION FOR HUMANE IMMIGRANT RIGHTS. Related document:1 Complaint, filed by CASA, INC., UNDOCUBLACK NETWORK, COALITION FOR HUMANE IMMIGRANT RIGHTS.(Sung, Esther)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons AG Bondi
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 03/25 7:57 AM
SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants.(znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 03/25 7:55 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. (znmw)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Error- New Case Tue 03/25 7:58 AM
NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR regarding1 Complaint,. The following error(s) need correction: Missing summonses- U.S. government. When naming a U.S. government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Related Case Mon 03/24 5:47 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 25-cv-0190. (Sung, Esther)
Related: [-]
1 1 35 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 03/24 5:45 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11563573) filed by CASA, INC., UNDOCUBLACK NETWORK, COALITION FOR HUMANE IMMIGRANT RIGHTS OF LOS ANGELES.(Sung, Esther)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Kristi Noem DHS,
Att: 3 Summons Todd Lyons ICE,
Att: 4 Summons Pete Flores CBP,
Att: 5 Summons Kika Scott USCIS,
Att: 6 Summons Donald Trump