New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Carol Bagley Amon
Referred: Vera M Scanlon
Case #: 1:25-cv-01626
Nature of Suit220 Real Property - Foreclosure
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 24, 2025 6:06 PM EDT
Defendant
"John Doe #1" through John Doe #12," the last twelve names being fictitious and unknown to plaintiff, the persons or parties intended being the tenants, occupants, persons or
34-42 93rd Street
Jackson Heights, NY 11372
Defendant
City Of New York Environmental Control Board
100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007
Defendant
Marco Lema
34-42 93rd Street
Jackson Heights, NY 11372
Defendant
New York City Department of Finance
One Centre Street
New York, NY 10007
Plaintiff
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee of the Indymac INDX Mortgage Trust 2007-AR5, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-ARd Under the Pooling and Servicing Agreement Dated March
Represented By
Jamie C. Krapf
Mccabe, Weisberg & Conway LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
12 12 misc Request for Certificate of Default Wed 04/30 4:55 PM
Request for Certificate of Default by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company (Krapf, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Krapf Declaration in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Filed Affidavits of Service,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Non-Military Affirmation,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
Thursday, April 24, 2025
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/24 9:54 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. New York City Department of Finance served on 4/1/2025, answer due 4/22/2025. (Krapf, Jamie)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/24 9:53 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. City Of New York Environmental Control Board served on 4/1/2025, answer due 4/22/2025. (Krapf, Jamie)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/24 9:52 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. Marco Lema served on 4/9/2025, answer due 4/30/2025. (Krapf, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
8 8 order Scheduling Order Thu 04/03 12:44 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference is scheduled for 7/24/2025 at 10:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon via ZoomGov. To gain access to the ZoomGov audio conferencing system, counsel and/or any pro se parties are to dial 1-646-828-7666; enter meeting ID 16121901090 and press the pound key; when asked for a participant ID, press the pound key; and enter passcode 091622 and press the pound key. Please note that your microphone will be automatically muted when you enter the virtual conference room. If another conference is underway, please remain on mute until the case is called. At that time, you may unmute your microphone by pressing *6 on your keypad. The parties must complete the attached Joint Proposed Case Management Plan (CMP) and file it on ECF no later than 7/14/2025. The Court reminds the parties of their responsibility to file a disclosure statement under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 within 30 days of appearing in this action, if applicable and if they have not yet done so. As to any LLC, the disclosure statement should identify all of the members and their respective citizenships. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 4/3/2025. (SH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
7 7 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Tue 03/25 9:10 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SDM)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Tue 03/25 9:09 AM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (SDM)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 03/25 9:08 AM
Summons Issued as to City Of New York Environmental Control Board, Marco Lema, New York City Department of Finance. (SDM)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 03/25 9:02 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SDM)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
4 4 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 03/24 6:10 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee of the Indymac INDX Mortgage Trust 2007-AR5, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-ARd Under the Pooling and Servicing Agreement Dated March (Krapf, Jamie)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 03/24 6:09 PM
Proposed Summons. by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee of the Indymac INDX Mortgage Trust 2007-AR5, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-ARd Under the Pooling and Servicing Agreement Dated March (Krapf, Jamie)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 03/24 6:07 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee of the Indymac INDX Mortgage Trust 2007-AR5, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-ARd Under the Pooling and Servicing Agreement Dated March identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Corporate Parent DB USA Corporation, Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Aktingesellschaft (Deutsche Bank AG) for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee of the Indymac INDX Mortgage Trust 2007-AR5, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-ARd Under the Pooling and Servicing Agreement Dated March. (Krapf, Jamie)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/24 6:00 PM
COMPLAINT against "John Doe #1" through John Doe #12," the last twelve names being fictitious and unknown to plaintiff, the persons or parties intended being the tenants, occupants, persons or, City Of New York Environmental Control Board, Marco Lema, New York City Department of Finance filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18884308 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee of the Indymac INDX Mortgage Trust 2007-AR5, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-ARd Under the Pooling and Servicing Agreement Dated March. (Krapf, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex 1-Schedule A Property Description,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex 2-Tax Warrant,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex 3 ECB Liens,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex 4 CEMA,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex 5 Note,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex 6 Mortgage,
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex 7 Loan Mod,
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex 8 AOM