Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Eduardo V Rodriguez
Case #: 4:25-bk-31569
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2025

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
AllEcom Corp.
10406 Kingston Creek Lane
Cypress, TX 77433
Represented By
Anabel King
Wauson King
contact info
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 6:26 PM CDT
Creditor
Harris County ESD #07
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o Jeannie L. Andresen PO Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
Jeannie Lee Andresen
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Harris County ESD #11
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o Jeannie Lee Andresen PO Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
Jeannie Lee Andresen
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Lone Star College System
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o Jeannie Lee Andresen PO Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
Jeannie Lee Andresen
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP
contact info
Creditor
The County of Comal, Texas
McCreary Veselka Bragg & Allen, PC Attn: Julie Anne Parsons PO Box 1269
Round Rock, TX 78680
Represented By
Julie Anne Parsons
Mccreary Veselka Bragg & Allen PC
contact info
Creditor
The County of Guadalupe, Texas
McCreary Veselka Bragg & Allen, PC Attn: Julie Anne Parsons PO Box 1269
Round Rock, TX 78680
Represented By
Julie Anne Parsons
Mccreary Veselka Bragg & Allen PC
contact info
Creditor
Harris County, ATTN: Property Tax Division
Harris County Attorney's Office P.O. Box 2848
Houston, TX 77252
Represented By
Susan R. Fuertes
Harris County Attorney'S Office
contact info
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Jayson B. Ruff
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 33 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
40 40 order Assume Lease or Executory Contract Wed 05/14 9:44 AM
Order Approving Assumption of Executory Contract Related [+] Signed on 5/14/2025. (njc7)
Related: [-] 23
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
39 39 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 05/06 12:09 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by John Easter Filed by on behalf of Eastern Funding LLC (Easter, John)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 04, 2025
38 38 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 05/04 11:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/04/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 35 Order on Emergency Motion
37 37 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 05/04 11:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/04/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 34 Generic Order
36 36 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 05/04 11:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/04/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 33 Generic Order
Friday, May 02, 2025
35 35 3 pgs order Emergency Fri 05/02 3:43 PM
Order Granting Interim Use of Cash Collateral, Interim Payments, and Interim Monthly Budget. Related [+], Signed on 5/2/2025. (njc7)
Related: [-] 4
34 34 2 pgs order Order on Generic Motion Fri 05/02 3:42 PM
Order. Related [+] Signed on 5/2/2025. (njc7)
Related: [-] 28
33 33 order Generic Order Fri 05/02 3:40 PM
Order Chapter 11 Status Conference. Signed on 5/2/2025 Related [+] (njc7)
Related: [-] 15 Order Setting Hearing
court Courtroom Minutes (Text) Fri 05/02 3:25 PM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 2:00 p.m.. Appearances: Anabal King for Debtor; Mr. Kha Pham, Corporate representative, present; Jayson Ruff for US Trustee. Minutes: Chapter 11 status conference held first. Ms. King provided a summary of case to the Court. Mr. Ruff also provided a summary and was questioned by the Court. Motion for Leave at28 taken up. Mr. Ruff advised the UST had no objection. Motion approved. Plan due 7/22/2025. Status Conference Order to be issued by the Court. Cash collateral4 taken up next. Debtor's Exhibits at Docket 29, #1 and 2, admitted. Mr. Pham was sworn in and his testimony was proffered by Ms. King. Mr. Pham verified the testimony. No cross-examination. Use of cash collateral through confirmation approved by the Court. Order signed by the Court. Related [+] (njc7)
Related: [-] 4 Emergency Motion, Motion to Use Cash Collateral,15 Order Setting Hearing,28 Generic Motion
Thursday, May 01, 2025
32 32 misc Statement of Financial Affairs Thu 05/01 10:48 AM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Amended (Filed By AllEcom Corp. ). (King, Anabel)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Operating Report - Debtor-in-Possession Monthly Thu 05/01 8:55 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period ending 3/31/2025, $28768 disbursed (Filed By AllEcom Corp. ). (King, Anabel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
30 30 misc Proposed Order Wed 04/30 4:01 PM
Proposed Order RE: Granting Use of Cash Collateral, Interim Payments, and Interim Monthly Budget (Filed By AllEcom Corp. ) Related [+] (King, Anabel)
Related: [-] 4 Emergency Motion, Motion to Use Cash Collateral
29 29 misc Exhibit List Wed 04/30 10:12 AM
Witness List, Exhibit List (Filed By AllEcom Corp. ) Related [+] (King, Anabel)
Related: [-] 4 Emergency Motion, Motion to Use Cash Collateral
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
Att: 3 Exhibit
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
28 28 5 pgs motion Generic Motion Tue 04/29 12:01 PM
Motion for Leave to Use Pre-Petition Bank Account Filed by Debtor AllEcom Corp. (King, Anabel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, April 25, 2025
27 27 misc Status Report Fri 04/25 9:10 AM
Status Report (Filed By AllEcom Corp. ) Related [+] (King, Anabel)
Related: [-] 15 Order Setting Hearing
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, April 24, 2025
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 04/24 11:37 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Melissa E Valdez Filed by on behalf of Harris County Municipal Utility District # 374 (Valdez, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
25 25 misc Equity Security Holders Tue 04/22 5:26 PM
Equity Security Holders (Filed By AllEcom Corp. ). (King, Anabel)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Certificate Tue 04/22 5:24 PM
Certificate Written Consent of Officer, Director and Sole Shareholder of AllEcom Corp. (Filed By AllEcom Corp. ). (King, Anabel)
Related: [-]
23 23 5 pgs motion Assume Lease or Executory Contract Tue 04/22 5:21 PM
Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract Filed by Debtor AllEcom Corp. (King, Anabel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
Att: 3 Exhibit
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Friday, April 18, 2025
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/18 11:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/18/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Order on Application to Employ
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
21 21 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Wed 04/16 11:25 AM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders (Filed By AllEcom Corp. ). (King, Anabel)
Related: [-]
20 20 2 pgs order Order to Employ Wed 04/16 9:12 AM
Order Granting Application to Employ Related [+] Signed on 4/16/2025. (njc7)
Related: [-] 18
Monday, April 07, 2025
19 19 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Mon 04/07 1:33 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Filed By AllEcom Corp. ). (King, Anabel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
18 18 11 pgs motion Employ Mon 04/07 1:29 PM
Application to Employ Wauson King as Bankruptcy Counsel for Debtor. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Debtor AllEcom Corp. (King, Anabel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
Att: 3 Exhibit
Att: 4 Exhibit
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Friday, April 04, 2025
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/04 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/04/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order Setting Hearing
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
16 16 misc Schedule A/B Wed 04/02 12:08 PM
Schedule A/B: Property Non-Individual , Schedule D Non-Individual- Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property , Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims Non-Individual , Schedule G Non-Individual- Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases , Schedule H Non-Individual- Codebtors , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual (Filed By AllEcom Corp. ). (King, Anabel)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Setting Hearing Wed 04/02 10:35 AM
Order for Electronic Chapter 11 Status Conference. Signed on 4/2/2025 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 5/2/2025 at 02:00 PM via telephone and video conference. (njc7)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Sunday, March 30, 2025
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 03/30 11:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/30/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order Setting Hearing
Saturday, March 29, 2025
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 03/29 11:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/29/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order Setting Hearing
Friday, March 28, 2025
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Fri 03/28 11:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Related [+] No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 03/28/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 for Non-Individual Debtor Set
11 11 notice Notice Fri 03/28 2:40 PM
Notice of Hearing . Related [+] Filed by AllEcom Corp. (King, Anabel)
Related: [-] 4 Emergency Motion, Motion to Use Cash Collateral
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 03/28 2:35 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Susan R. Fuertes Filed by on behalf of Harris County, ATTN: Property Tax Division (Fuertes, Susan)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs order Setting Hearing Fri 03/28 11:38 AM
Order Granting Interim Use of Cash Collateral, Interim Payments, and Interim Monthly Budget. Signed on 3/28/2025 Related [+] Further hearing scheduled for 5/2/2025 at 02:00 PM via telephone and video conference. (njc7)
Related: [-] 4 Emergency Motion, Motion to Use Cash Collateral
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit 1
court Courtroom Minutes (Text) Fri 03/28 11:25 AM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 11:00 a.m.. Appearances: Anabel King for the Debtor; Mr. Kha Pham, Corporate representative; Jayson Ruff for US Trustee. Minutes: Hearing on cash collateral held. Opening statements by Ms. King. Debtors Exhibits at Docket 8, #1 and 2 admitted. Mr. Pham was sworn in and his testimony was proffered by Ms. King. Mr. Pham verified the testimony. No cross-examination. Interim use of cash collateral approved. Proposed Order to be signed by the Court. Further hearing set for 5/2/2025 at 2:00 p.m., via electronic hearing. Related [+] (njc7)
Related: [-] 4 Emergency Motion, Motion to Use Cash Collateral
Thursday, March 27, 2025
8 8 misc Exhibit List Thu 03/27 3:44 PM
Witness List, Exhibit List (Filed By AllEcom Corp. ) Related [+] (King, Anabel)
Related: [-] 4 Emergency Motion, Motion to Use Cash Collateral
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
Att: 3 Exhibit
7 7 order Setting Hearing Thu 03/27 2:49 PM
Order Setting Hearing Signed on 3/27/2025 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 3/28/2025 at 11:00 AM via telephone and video conference. (njc7)
Related: [-] 4 Emergency Motion, Motion to Use Cash Collateral
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 03/27 12:11 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jeannie Lee Andresen Filed by on behalf of Harris County ESD #11, Lone Star College System, Harris County ESD #07 (Andresen, Jeannie)
Related: [-]
5 5 3 pgs motion Expedite Hearing Thu 03/27 11:25 AM
Motion to Expedite Hearing Related [+]. Filed by Debtor AllEcom Corp. (King, Anabel)
Related: [-] 4 Emergency Motion, Motion to Use Cash Collateral
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Exhibit
4 4 7 pgs motion Cash Collateral (Use) Thu 03/27 11:23 AM
Emergency Motion , Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Debtor AllEcom Corp. (King, Anabel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
Att: 3 Exhibit
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 03/25 1:14 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Julie Anne Parsons Filed by on behalf of The County of Guadalupe, Texas, The County of Comal, Texas (Parsons, Julie)
Related: [-]
trustee Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 03/25 9:44 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jayson B. Ruff (Ruff, Jayson)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
2 2 trustee Chapter 11 Meeting of Creditors for Corporate Debtor Set (BNC NOTICING) Tue 03/25 10:34 AM
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 for Non-Individual Debtor Set 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/1/2025 at 10:00 AM, US Trustee Houston Teleconference. Last day to object to dischargeability under section 523 is 6/30/2025. Proofs of Claims due by 7/30/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 9/22/2025. (Ruff, Jayson)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Mon 03/24 6:02 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by AllEcom Corp.. (King, Anabel)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Mon 03/24 6:03 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-31569 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A26019480. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]