Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Eli J Richardson
Referred: Jeffery S Frensley
Case #: 3:25-cv-00311
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal--Other Contract
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 03, 2025 6:41 AM CDT
Defendant
Bradley Barham
Represented By
Jerry Gonzalez
Law Office Of Jerry Gonzalez
contact info
Jesse Ford Harbison
Jesse Harbison Law, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc.
Represented By
Spencer H. Reed
Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc,
contact info
Jonathan O. Harris
Jackson Lewis, P.C.
contact info
John Richard Adams
Jackson Lewis P.C. (nashville Office)
contact info
Kelsey Lee Sanders
Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc,
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
13 13 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/01 3:31 PM
ORDER granting10 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Spencer Reed to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 05/01/2025. (lh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
12 12 misc Business Entity Disclosure Statement Tue 03/25 2:58 PM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc.. (Adams, John)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Tue 03/25 9:38 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Jonathan O. Harris, John Richard Adams admitted to this court . (kc)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Tue 03/25 9:50 AM
UT State Bar status verified as active for Spencer H. Reed not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured . (kc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/24 3:51 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Bradley Barham.(Gonzalez, Jerry)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/24 3:14 PM
MOTION for attorney Spencer Reed to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4285522) by Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc..(Adams, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Attachment Registration Application for Practice Pending Admission
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/24 1:46 PM
NOTICE by Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc. Notice of Counsel of Record for Plaintiff(Adams, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Motion for Substitution of Counsel,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Order Granting Substitution of Counsel
8 8 2 pgs order Order Mon 03/24 10:07 AM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 3/24/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/24 9:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Richard Adams on behalf of Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc. (Adams, John)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/24 9:22 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan O. Harris on behalf of Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc. (Harris, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Mon 03/24 8:49 AM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 6/24/2025 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (sb)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Mon 03/24 8:46 AM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (sb)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Mon 03/24 8:46 AM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (sb)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Mon 03/24 8:45 AM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (sb)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Mon 03/24 8:54 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Jerry Gonzalez, Jesse Ford Harbison, Kelsey Lee Sanders admitted to this court . (sb)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Mon 03/24 8:55 AM
UT State Bar status verified as active for Spencer H. Reed not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured . (sb)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - PHV Mon 03/24 8:55 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Spencer H. Reed: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 4/14/2025. (sb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 03/24 8:45 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bradley Barham from Chancery Court for the 20th Judicial District, Davidson County, Tennessee, case number 24-0956 IV. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNMDC-4282060)(sb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Chancery Court Complaint with incorporated exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-Unexecuted summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3-Chancery Court order granting Plaintiff's motion for alternative,
Att: 4 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet