Mattathil et al v. Red Lightning Logistics
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Donna M Ryu |
Case #: | 4:25-cv-02727 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2025 |
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 1:55 AM PDT |
Defendant
Red Lightning Logistics
|
|
Plaintiff
Yessica Barriga
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Noemi Lua
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anish Mattathil
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Thursday, May 08, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Anish Mattathil, Yessica Barriga, Noemi Lua.. (Granahan, Conor) |
|
Friday, April 25, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 5/9/2025. (ig, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, April 08, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 4/22/2025. (ig, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, March 25, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See[LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 6/25/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/2/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, March 24, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() COMPLAINT against Red Lightning Logistics. Filed by Noemi Lua, Anish Mattathil, Yessica Barriga.(Granahan, Conor) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Mon 03/24 8:44 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/7/2025. (pjf, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Mon 03/24 2:02 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Error in with PDF for Complaint and new Civil Cover Sheet. Unable to open in Adobe. Please refile. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Anish Mattathil,1 Complaint filed by Anish Mattathil. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
||
Friday, March 21, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Please use a current 12/2024 Civil Cover Sheet. They can be found on our website, https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover SheetThis filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re:1 Complaint filed by Anish Mattathil (pjf, COURT STAFF) |