California Northern District Court
Case #: 4:21-cr-00236
Case Filed:Jun 08, 2021
Last checked: Thursday Mar 27, 2025 12:58 AM PDT
Defendant
Matthew Rocha (1)
Represented By
Jack D. Gordon
The Gordon Law Group
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Leif M. Dautch
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
John C Bostic
Cooley LLP
contact info
Katherine Griffin
Doj-Usao
contact info
Marja-Liisa Overbeck
Department Of Justice
contact info
Kevin R Rubino
contact info

GPO Jan 13 2023
STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Matthew Rocha Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/13/2023. Status Conference re Sentencing re-set for 6/13/2023 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2023)
GPO Jun 02 2023
STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Matthew Rocha 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Matthew Rocha filed by USA, Motions terminated: 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Matthew Rocha filed by USA. Status Conference re Sentencing set for 5/7/2024 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - To be determined before Judge Richard Seeborg.. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/2/2023. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2023)
GPO May 03 2024
STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING SENTENCING CONTROL DATE as to Matthew Rocha. Status Conference previously set for 5/7/2024 is continued to 12/10/2024 at 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/3/2024. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2024)

Docket last updated: 03/27/2025 2:02 AM PDT
Tuesday, June 08, 2021
1 1 FELONY INFORMATION as to Matthew Rocha (1) count(s) 1. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION for Sealing Order by USA as to Matthew Rocha. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
3 3 SEALING ORDER 2 as to Matthew Rocha (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/8/21. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]