Florida Northern District Court
Judge:Allen C Winsor
Referred: Martin A Fitzpatrick
Case #: 4:25-cv-00135
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 6:03 AM EDT
Defendant
PERFECT PLANTS NURSERY LLC
Represented By
JAMES DOUGLAS MORGAN
O'Hara Law Firm - Jacksonville Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
IMAGE PROFESSIONALS GMBH
Represented By
DANIEL DESOUZA
Desouza Law Pa - Coral Springs Fl
contact info


Docket last updated: 66 minutes ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Mon 05/12 1:12 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by PERFECT PLANTS NURSERY LLC. (MORGAN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 05/12 11:37 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR notified that action is needed Re:9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 5/9/2025. (***None filed to date as to PERFECT PLANTS NURSERY LLC.***) (kdm)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
9 9 order Scheduling Order Fri 04/25 10:05 AM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 4/25/2025. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 5/9/2025 . Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/27/2025 . Discovery due by 8/22/2025 . Trial set for 2/24/2026 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR. (kdm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/23 2:21 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by PERFECT PLANTS NURSERY LLC. (MORGAN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Tue 04/08 1:22 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by IMAGE PROFESSIONALS GMBH. (DESOUZA, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/03 12:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by IMAGE PROFESSIONALS GMBH. PERFECT PLANTS NURSERY LLC served on 4/2/2025, answer due 4/23/2025. (DESOUZA, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
5 5 notice AO 121 Copyright Case Notification Wed 04/02 8:12 AM
AO 121 Copyright New Case Notification. Copy mailed to the Register of Copyrights, U.S. Copyright Office, 101 Independence Ave. S.E., Washington, D.C. 20559-6000. (kdm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 03/25 9:55 AM
Summons Issued as to PERFECT PLANTS NURSERY LLC. (tss)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Docket Annotation Tue 03/25 9:54 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference, please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (tss)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 03/25 8:13 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (DESOUZA, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 03/25 8:12 AM
COMPLAINT against Perfect Plants Nursery LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AFLNDC-9414431.), filed by Image Professionals GmbH. (DESOUZA, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Copyright Registration,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Infringement Screenshot,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons