New York Northern District Court
Judge:Anne M Nardacci
Referred: Daniel J Stewart
Case #: 1:25-cv-00364
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2025
Case in other court:New York State Supreme Court, Rensselaer County, EF2025-278895
Last checked: Thursday May 08, 2025 4:22 AM EDT
Cross Defendant
Richard Hurley
Represented By
Lewis R. Silverman
Silverman & Associates
contact info
Cross Defendant
Troy City School District
Represented By
Lewis R. Silverman
Silverman & Associates
contact info
Defendant
Richard Hurley
Represented By
Valentina Lumaj
Silverman & Associates
contact info
Lewis R. Silverman
Silverman & Associates
contact info
Defendant
Troy City School District
Represented By
Valentina Lumaj
Silverman & Associates
contact info
Lewis R. Silverman
Silverman & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeri'yah Ford
Represented By
Jasper Lee Mills, III
Mills Law Group PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Cross Claimant
City of Troy
Terminated: 04/04/2025
Defendant
City of Troy
Terminated: 04/04/2025


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
15 15 service Certificate of Service Wed 05/07 6:23 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard Hurley, Troy City School District re14 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Richard Hurley, Troy City School District. Motion returnable before Judge Ann M. Nardacci (Lumaj, Valentina)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Dismiss Wed 05/07 6:22 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Richard Hurley, Troy City School District. Motion returnable before Judge Ann M. Nardacci Response to Motion due by 5/28/2025. Reply to Response to Motion due by 6/4/2025 (Lumaj, Valentina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 3 Memorandum of Law
Thursday, May 01, 2025
13 13 order 1 - Terminate Hearings Order Thu 05/01 5:43 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Rule 16 conference set for 5/8/2025 and the 5/1/2025 deadline for the submission of a joint Civil Case Management Plan and exchange of Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED WITHOUT DATE. The hearing and related deadlines will be reset, if deemed necessary, after disposition of the impending Motion to Dismiss. (spl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
12 12 order Order on Letter Request Thu 04/24 3:15 PM
TEXT ORDER granting Defendants'11 Letter Request seeking a briefing schedule with regard to the forthcoming motion to dismiss in this matter. Defendants shall file their motion by May 7, 2025. Plaintiff shall file an opposition to the motion by June 6, 2025. Defendants shall file any reply by June 27, 2025. SO ORDERED by U.S. District Judge Anne M. Nardacci on 4/24/2025. (mab)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
11 11 motion Letter Request/Motion Fri 04/11 10:16 AM
First Letter Motion from Valentina Lumaj for Richard Hurley, Troy City School District requesting Request to So Order Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss submitted to Judge Ann M. Nardacci . (Lumaj, Valentina)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
10 10 2 pgs order Order Fri 04/04 11:27 AM
STIPULATION and ORDER of DISCONTINUANCE solely as to Defendant, City of Troy. Signed by U.S. District Judge Anne M. Nardacci on 4/4/2025. (mab)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
9 9 misc Stipulation Wed 04/02 8:40 PM
STIPULATION of Discontinuance as to City of Troy by Richard Hurley, Troy City School District submitted to Judge Daniel J. Stewart. (Lumaj, Valentina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/01 10:29 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Valentina Lumaj on behalf of Richard Hurley, Troy City School District (Lumaj, Valentina)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
7 7 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 03/31 6:50 PM
TEXT ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Richard Hurley and Troy City School District answers due on 4/14/2025. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 3/31/2025. (spl)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 03/28 12:05 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or move filed by Richard Hurley, Troy City School District. Response to Motion due by 4/18/2025 Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (Silverman, Lewis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Tue 03/25 10:24 AM
***Answer due date updated for Richard Hurley answer due 3/31/2025; Troy City School District answer due 3/31/2025. (see)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Admission Requirement Tue 03/25 10:20 AM
NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party City of Troy; Attorney Richard T. Morrissey. Phone number is (518) 279-7157. Admissions due by 4/7/2025. {Mailed to Attorney Richard Morrissey on 3/24/2025 by regular mail}(see)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc G.O. 25 Filing Order Tue 03/25 10:16 AM
G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 5/8/2025 at 11:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 5/1/2025. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) {Copy sent to Attorney Richard Morrissey on 3/24/2025 by regular mail}(see)
Related: [-]
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Crossclaim Tue 03/25 10:12 AM
VERIFIED STATE COURT ANSWER to Complaint with CROSSCLAIM against Richard Hurley and Troy City School District by City of Troy.(see)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc State Court Complaint Tue 03/25 10:05 AM
STATE COURT VERIFIED COMPLAINT relating to1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff(s) in New York State Supreme Court, Rensselaer County. (see)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 03/25 10:01 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York State Supreme Court, Rensselaer County, case number EF2025-278895 (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-7071509) filed by Richard Hurley and Troy City School District.(see)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet