Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Jay C Zainey
Referred: Donna Phillips Currault
Case #: 2:25-cv-00576
Nature of Suit120 Contract - Marine
Cause28:1333 Marine Contract
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 9:03 AM CDT
Defendant
Patriot Construction and Industrial, LLC
Represented By
John P. D'Avello
Mouledoux, Bland, Legrand & Brackett, LLC
contact info
Daniel J. Hoerner
Mouledoux, Bland, Legrand & Brackett, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Triple S Marine, LLC
Represented By
Martin S. Bohman
Bohman Morse, LLC
contact info
Harry E. Morse
Bohman Morse LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Patriot Marine, LLC
Represented By
Martin S. Bohman
Bohman Morse, LLC
contact info
Harry E. Morse
Bohman Morse LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/25 4:37 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Patriot Construction and Industrial, LLC.Attorney Daniel J. Hoerner added to party Patriot Construction and Industrial, LLC(pty:dft).(Hoerner, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/23 8:54 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Patriot Construction and Industrial, LLC served on 4/2/2025, answer due 4/23/2025. (Morse, Harry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 03/25 2:07 PM
Summons Issued as to Patriot Construction and Industrial, LLC. (car) (Main Document 3 replaced on 3/25/2025) (car)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Tue 03/25 10:55 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (cc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/25 10:48 AM
COMPLAINT against Patriot Construction and Industrial, LLC (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10933911) filed by Patriot Marine, LLC, Triple S Marine, LLC.Attorney Harry E. Morse added to party Patriot Marine, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Harry E. Morse added to party Triple S Marine, LLC(pty:pla).(Morse, Harry) Modified text on 3/25/2025 (car). Modified on 3/25/2025 (car)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons