Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:23-bk-00998

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joseph N Callaway
Case #: 5:25-ap-00052
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
American Express National Bank
4315 South 2700 West
Salt Lake City, UT 84184
Represented By
American Express National Bank
contact info
Defendant
American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc.
160 Mine Lake Court Suite 200
Raleigh, NC 27615
Represented By
American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Bircher III, Trustee
Davis Hartman Wright, PLLC 209 Pollock Street
New Bern, NC 28560
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Buckmiller & Frost, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, April 18, 2025
4 4 order Extend Time Fri 04/18 9:20 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+] Answer due by 5/23/2025. (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] 3
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
3 3 motion Extend Time/Deadlines Wed 04/16 11:41 AM
Motion to Extend Time to File Answer, filed by Charles M. Ivey III on behalf of American Express National Bank, American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. Related [+]. (Ivey, Charles)
Related: [-] ument no.1 Complaint
Monday, March 24, 2025
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 03/24 1:23 PM
Summons Issued on American Express National Bank Answer Due 04/23/2025; American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. Answer Due 04/23/2025 (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/24 1:23 PM
Adversary case 25-00052 5. Complaint by John C. Bircher, III, Chapter 7 Trustee for Covenant Solar Tech, LLC against American Express National Bank, American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. (Fee Deferred) (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits 1 - 5