Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:23-bk-00998

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joseph N Callaway
Case #: 5:25-ap-00053
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ally Bank
200 West Civic Center Drive
Sandy, UT 84070
Represented By
Ally Bank
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Bircher III, Trustee
Davis Hartman Wright, PLLC 209 Pollock Street
New Bern, NC 28560
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Buckmiller & Frost, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
5 5 order Extend Time Fri 04/25 10:25 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+] Answer due by 5/23/2025. (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] 3
Thursday, April 24, 2025
utility Terminate Deadline (Public) Thu 04/24 9:02 AM
Deadline(s) Terminated. Revised Proposed Order Received. Related [+] (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] ument no. 4 Deficiency Notice - Attorney (BK)
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
4 4 court Deficiency Notice - Attorney (BK) Tue 04/22 8:12 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Pamela Keenan. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: The order uploaded is incorrect, illegible or improperly formatted (The order does not have a 3" top margin.). Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief, or in the matter being forwarded to the judge for appropriate action. Related [+] Due by 5/2/2025. (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] ument no.3 Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to File Answer, filed by Ally Bank
Monday, April 21, 2025
3 3 motion Extend Time/Deadlines Mon 04/21 4:56 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to File Answer, filed by Pamela P. Keenan on behalf of Ally Bank. (Keenan, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 03/24 1:30 PM
Summons Issued on Ally Bank Answer Due 04/23/2025 (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/24 1:30 PM
Adversary case 25-00053 5. Complaint by John C. Bircher, III, Chapter 7 Trustee for Covenant Solar Tech, LLC against Ally Bank (Fee Deferred) (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - List of Constructively Fraudulent Transfers