Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:25-bk-30300

Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 12
Judge:John P Gustafson
Case #: 3:25-ap-03012
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
National Funding, Inc.
9820 Towne Center Drive #200
San Diego, CA 92121
Represented By
National Funding, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Martinez Dairy LLC, Plaintiff
3070 County Road 67
Edison, OH 43320
Represented By
Eric R. Neuman
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/25 1:33 PM
Summons Service Executed on National Funding, Inc. 3/25/2025 (Neuman, Eric aty)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Summons Issued Tue 03/25 11:55 AM
Summons issued on Plaintiff for service on Defendant(s) National Funding, Inc. Answer due 4/24/2025. Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/29/2025 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom #2 Toledo JPG. This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the summons in an adversary proceeding. The attached summons has been sealed, processed, and docketed by the Clerk. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of the summons will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004(a) and F.R.C.P. 4, it is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to promptly serve the summons, a copy of the complaint, and, if applicable, a copy of any pre-trial or adversary case management order on defendant(s). To be timely, the summons and a copy of the complaint must be served within seven (7) days of issuance per Bankruptcy Rule 7004(e). Service of the summons is prescribed by Bankruptcy Rule 7004 and F.R.C.P. 4. If a summons is not timely served, an ''alias'' summons must be requested from the Clerk. Certification or proof of service by plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel is made by completing the Certificate of Service portion of the original summons. Attorneys should docket the summons, once served, using the Summons Service Executed event within CM/ECF. (mhutt)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/25 10:05 AM
Adversary case 25-03012 Complaint by Martinez Dairy LLC against National Funding, Inc.. Fee Amount $0 Nature of Suit:21 (Validity, Priority or Extent of Lien or Other Interest in Property; Rule 7001(2)) (Neuman, Eric aty)
Related: [-]