Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:25-bk-30300

Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 12
Judge:John P Gustafson
Case #: 3:25-ap-03013
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
U.S. Small Business Administration
1350 Euclid Avenue Suite 211
Cleveland, OH 44115
Represented By
U.S. Small Business Administration
contact info
Plaintiff
Martinez Dairy LLC
3070 County Road 67
Edison, OH 43320
Represented By
Eric R. Neuman
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Fri 05/09 11:33 AM
Joint Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by U.S. Small Business Administration. (Rojas, Guillermo aty)
Related: [-]
utility Notice Requiring Corrective Document Fri 05/09 10:38 AM
NOTICE REQUIRING CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT: Wrong ECF docket event code used. Related [+] (dzeme)
Related: [-] 7 Stipulation filed by Defendant U.S. Small Business Administration
Thursday, May 08, 2025
7 7 misc Stipulation Thu 05/08 2:13 PM
Stipulation By U.S. Small Business Administration and Martinez Dairy LLC . Filed by Defendant U.S. Small Business Administration. (Rojas, Guillermo aty) NOTICE REQUIRING CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT: Wrong ECF docket event code used. (dzeme)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
6 6 BNC Notice of Order on Motion to Extend Time Sat 05/03 12:12 AM
Notice of Order on Motion to Extend Time w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
5 5 order Extend Time Wed 04/30 11:47 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time for the United States of America to Respond to the Complaint Related [+] Signed on 4/30/2025. IT IS ORDERED that the United States of America shall have an additional 30 days, until May 29, 2025 , to move, plead, or answer in response to the Complaint filed by Plaintiff Martinez Dairy, LLC. (dzeme crt)
Related: [-] 4
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
4 4 motion Extend Time Tue 04/29 4:24 PM
Motion to Extend Time to Answer Complaint Filed by U.S. Small Business Administration Related [+] (Rojas, Guillermo aty)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 03/26 12:20 PM
Summons Service Executed on Attorney General of the United States 3/26/2025; Office of the United States Attorney 3/26/2025; U.S. Small Business Administration 3/26/2025; United States Small Business Administration 3/26/2025 (Neuman, Eric aty)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
2 2 cmp Summons Issued (Agency or officer of the United States) Tue 03/25 5:00 PM
Summons issued on Plaintiff for service on Defendant(s) U.S. Small Business Administration Answer due 4/29/2025. Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/29/2025 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom #2 Toledo JPG. This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the summons in an adversary proceeding. The attached summons has been sealed, processed, and docketed by the Clerk. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of the summons will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004(a) and F.R.C.P. 4, it is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to promptly serve the summons, a copy of the complaint, and, if applicable, a copy of any pre-trial or adversary case management order on defendant(s). To be timely, the summons and a copy of the complaint must be served within fourteen (14) days of issuance per Bankruptcy Rule 7004(e). Service of the summons is prescribed by Bankruptcy Rule 7004 and F.R.C.P. 4. If a summons is not timely served, an ''alias'' summons must be requested from the Clerk. Certification or proof of service by plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel is made by completing the Certificate of Service portion of the original summons. Attorneys should docket the summons, once served, using the Summons Service Executed event within CM/ECF. (mhutt)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/25 12:32 PM
Adversary case 25-03013 Complaint by Martinez Dairy LLC against U.S. Small Business Administration District Office, Attorney General of the United States, Office of the United States Attorney, United States Small Business Administration. Fee Amount $0 Nature of Suit:21 (Validity, Priority or Extent of Lien or Other Interest in Property; Rule 7001(2)) (Neuman, Eric aty)
Related: [-]