Florida Southern District Court
Judge:William P Dimitrouleas
Case #: 0:25-cv-60565
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 9:54 AM EDT
Defendant
Grieco Chevrolet Fort Lauderdale LLC
Represented By
Kenneth Lee Paretti
Quinton & Paretti, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jibrael S. Hindi
Represented By
Faaris Kamal Uddin
The Law Offices Of Jibrael S. Hindi
contact info
Gerald Donald Lane, Jr.
The Law Offices Of Jibrael S. Hindi, PLLC
contact info
Zane Charles Hedaya
The Law Offices Of Jibrael S. Hindi
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Thu 05/08 5:03 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Jibrael S. Hindi (Hedaya, Zane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Thu 04/17 7:50 AM
ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Grieco Chevrolet Fort Lauderdale LLC. Response/Answer due 5/12/2025. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/16/2025. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extension of Time Wed 04/16 3:08 PM
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to file response Plaintiff's Complaint re1 Complaint by Grieco Chevrolet Fort Lauderdale LLC. Attorney Kenneth Lee Paretti added to party Grieco Chevrolet Fort Lauderdale LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 4/30/2025.(Paretti, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
Thursday, March 27, 2025
4 4 3 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Thu 03/27 11:59 AM
ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/27/2025. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 03/25 2:53 PM
Summons Issued as to Grieco Chevrolet Fort Lauderdale LLC. (jas)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 03/25 2:45 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (jas)
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 03/25 1:25 PM
COMPLAINT against Grieco Chevrolet Fort Lauderdale LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18311608, filed by Jibrael S. Hindi.(Hedaya, Zane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)