Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Beth Bloom
Case #: 1:25-cv-21370
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:0101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 9:54 AM EDT
Defendant
The Clinic USA LLC
Defendant
Limor Weinberg
Plaintiff
Great Bowery, Inc.
Represented By
Rosemary Gene Sparrow
The Law Firm Of Higbee And Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 04/15 2:46 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Great Bowery, Inc.. Limor Weinberg waiver sent on 4/11/2025, response/answer due 6/10/2025. (Sparrow, Rosemary)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 04/15 2:44 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Great Bowery, Inc.. The Clinic USA LLC waiver sent on 4/11/2025, response/answer due 6/10/2025. (Sparrow, Rosemary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
8 8 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/26 11:20 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Great Bowery, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Florian Sommet for Great Bowery, Inc. (Sparrow, Rosemary)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Wed 03/26 10:55 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered ; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (Florian Sommet, Copyright Holder is not listed on the case). (pc)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/26 9:43 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Great Bowery, Inc. (Sparrow, Rosemary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
5 5 6 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Wed 03/26 8:51 AM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/25/2025. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 03/25 2:53 PM
Summons Issued as to The Clinic USA LLC, Limor Weinberg. (pc)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Form AO 120/121 Tue 03/25 2:52 PM
FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (pc)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 03/25 2:28 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 03/25 1:34 PM
COMPLAINT against The Clinic USA LLC, Limor Weinberg. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18311573, filed by GREAT BOWERY, INC. d/b/a TRUNK ARCHIVE.(Sparrow, Rosemary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits A-G,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons for The Clinic USA LLC,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons for Limor Weinberg