Nix v. Lipari Foods Operating Company, LLC
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Laurie J Michelson |
Referred: | David R Grand |
Case #: | 2:25-cv-10830 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2025 |
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 10:05 AM EDT |
Defendant
Lipari Foods Operating Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Theron Nix
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 18, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() STIPULATED ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT'S RESPONSIVE PLEADING re1 Complaint. Response due by 5/30/2025. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (TDam) |
|
Thursday, April 17, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Paul Lushnat on behalf of Lipari Foods Operating Company, LLC. (Lushnat, Joshua) |
|
Thursday, April 03, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() CASE MANAGEMENT REQUIREMENTS. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (TDam) |
|
Wednesday, April 02, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Paulina Rose Kennedy on behalf of Theron Nix. (Kennedy, Paulina) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Jason J. Thompson on behalf of Theron Nix. (Thompson, Jason) |
|
Monday, March 31, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Lipari Foods Operating Company, LLC served on 3/27/2025, answer due 4/17/2025. (Young, Jesse) |
|
Wednesday, March 26, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
![]() SUMMONS Issued for *Lipari Foods Operating Company, LLC * (LHam) |
|
misc
Pay Fee - Civil Case
Wed 03/26 9:13 AM
Filing Fee for Civil Case Received by Theron Nix. Receipt No: AMIEDC-10171585 - Fee: $405 re1 Complaint,,. (Young, Jesse) |
||
Tuesday, March 25, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. Correction due by 4/8/2025 (LHam) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT filed by Theron Nix against Lipari Foods Operating Company, LLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. IFP Application to Follow. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Young, Jesse) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
notice
Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option
Tue 03/25 3:52 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (LHam) |