Arkansas Western District Court
Judge:Timothy L Brooks
Case #: 5:25-cv-05068
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 25, 2025 2:05 PM CDT
Defendant
AppFolio, Inc.
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff
Jose Del Rosario Hernandez Franco
Represented By
McKenzie R Czabaj
Consumer Justice Law Firm PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement - Filed by Attorney Wed 04/16 12:22 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Younger, Robert)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/16 12:20 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Younger, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 04/10 5:09 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant AppFolio, Inc.'s answer or other responsive pleading is now due on May 8, 2025. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 10, 2025. (ee)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement - Filed by Attorney Thu 04/10 4:39 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by AppFolio, Inc.. (Hoffer, Rachel)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 04/10 4:38 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re2 Complaint or Otherwise Respond by AppFolio, Inc..(Hoffer, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, March 31, 2025
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/31 3:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jose Del Rosario Hernandez Franco. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 3/27/2025, answer due 4/17/2025. (Czabaj, McKenzie)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/31 3:14 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jose Del Rosario Hernandez Franco. AppFolio, Inc. served on 3/26/2025, answer due 4/16/2025. (Czabaj, McKenzie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 03/25 1:31 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to AppFolio, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service.(mll)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Magistrate Notice/Consent Form Tue 03/25 1:28 PM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form.(mll)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Tue 03/25 1:25 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against AppFolio, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Filing fee of $405.00 received and to be receipted in FSM office) filed by Jose Del Rosario Hernandez Franco.(mll)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 03/25 1:06 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Jose Del Rosario Hernandez Franco.(mll)
Related: [-]