Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Nathaniel M Gorton
Case #: 1:25-cv-10692
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 7:25 AM EDT
Defendant
Hanscom Federal Credit Union
Represented By
Keerthi Sugumaran
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Alexander Reganata
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Lisa Quintiliani
Represented By
Janet R. Ruggieri
Murphy & Rudolf, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/08 10:55 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Reganata on behalf of Hanscom Federal Credit Union Related [+]
Related: [-] ganata, Alexander
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/08 10:29 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Keerthi Sugumaran on behalf of Hanscom Federal Credit Union (Sugumaran, Keerthi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 03/26 8:42 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (JKK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 03/25 7:47 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (SEC)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 03/25 2:23 PM
COMPLAINT against Hanscom Federal Credit Union Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10911452 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Lisa Quintiliani.(Ruggieri, Janet)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Form,
Att: 3 Notice of Appearance