New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jeannette A Vargas
Referred: Valerie Figueredo
Case #: 1:25-cv-02456
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause20:1415 IDEA: Challenge decision re education for handicapped
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 5:46 AM EDT
Defendant
New York City Department of Education
100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007
Plaintiff
Cuddy Law Firm, P.L.L.C.
5693 South Street Road
Auburn, NY 13021
Represented By
Andrew K. Cuddy
Cuddy Law Firm
contact info
Benjamin Kopp
Cuddy Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 05/06 10:47 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo. (Signed by Judge Jeannette A. Vargas on 5/6/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/11 2:23 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew K. Cuddy on behalf of Cuddy Law Firm, P.L.L.C...(Cuddy, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 03/26 10:50 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department of Education..(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 03/26 9:55 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jeannette A. Vargas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 03/26 9:55 AM
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 03/26 9:55 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 03/25 2:56 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Cuddy Law Firm, P.L.L.C...(Kopp, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 03/25 2:54 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kopp, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/25 2:53 PM
COMPLAINT against New York City Department of Education. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30824166)Document filed by Cuddy Law Firm, P.L.L.C...(Kopp, Benjamin)
Related: [-]