Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:William L Campbell, Jr
Referred: Jeffery S Frensley
Case #: 3:25-cv-00333
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 9:09 AM CDT
Defendant
Alan L. Jakes
Represented By
Mark A. Polk
White & Polk, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
John Does I-X
Defendant
Kevin Miller
Represented By
Hannah Grace Moore
Howell & Fisher, PLLC
contact info
Robert M. Burns
Howell & Fisher, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Charles R. Mullins
Represented By
Fred C. Statum, III
Manier & Herod, PC
contact info
Defendant
Paul Holder Realty & Auction
Represented By
Hannah Grace Moore
Howell & Fisher, PLLC
contact info
Robert M. Burns
Howell & Fisher, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Ronald Ray Talbert
Represented By
M. Trevor Galligan
Galligan & Newman
contact info
Defendant
Dorinda Walker
Represented By
Hannah Grace Moore
Howell & Fisher, PLLC
contact info
Robert M. Burns
Howell & Fisher, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Livia Walker
Represented By
Hannah Grace Moore
Howell & Fisher, PLLC
contact info
Robert M. Burns
Howell & Fisher, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Thasha A. Boyd
946 Old Harrison Ferry Rd.
McMinnville, TN 37110


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
30 30 order Order on Motion for Entry of Default Tue 05/06 5:44 PM
TEXT ORDER denying as moot Motion for Entry of Default21 : The Clerk finds that the filing of Defendant Ronald Ray Talbert's Motion to Dismiss26 renders moot Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default21 ; therefore, the Motion is DENIED. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 05/06/2025. (lh)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
29 29 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 05/06 9:29 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Thasha A. Boyd. (ad)
Related: [-]
28 28 respoth Reply Tue 05/06 9:27 AM
Plaintiff's Combined:1) Sur-Reply and Reply to PHRA Defendants'25 Response to Plaintiff's Combined Countermotion and Response to Their10 Motion(s) for Transfer of Venue and/or Motion to Dismiss by Thasha A. Boyd (ad)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
27 27 4 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Mon 04/28 3:52 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of26 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Ronald Talbert's Motion to Dismiss filed by Ronald Ray Talbert Defendant Ronald Talbert's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss . (Galligan, M.)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Dismiss Mon 04/28 3:50 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Ronald Talbert's Motion to Dismiss by Ronald Ray Talbert. (Galligan, M.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
25 25 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 04/25 4:58 PM
REPLY to Response to re10 MOTION for Transfer of Venue or, in the Alternative, Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Complaint and Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Jurisdiction of State Claims/Cases AND Response In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Maintain Venue In/Under This District and Division (DE 17 filed by Kevin Miller, Paul Holder Realty & Auction, Dorinda Walker, Livia Walker. (Burns, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
24 24 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 04/24 3:27 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re21 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Ronald Ray Talbert filed by Ronald Ray Talbert.(Galligan, M.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Defendant Talbert's Memorandum of Law in Support of his Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default,
Att: 2 Exhibit Letter from Homeland Community Bank - Ex. 1 to Memorandum of Law
misc Annotation - Bar Status Thu 04/24 2:03 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for M. Trevor Galligan admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/23 3:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by M. Trevor Galligan on behalf of Ronald Ray Talbert (Galligan, M.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
22 22 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 04/22 2:59 PM
ORDER: This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. §§ 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of Court. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 04/22/2025. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Default (Rule 55(a) Entry of Default) Tue 04/22 2:16 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default as to Ronald Ray Talbert by Thasha A. Boyd. (ad)
Related: [-]
18 18 15 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Tue 04/22 8:50 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Charles R. Mullins .(Statum, Fred)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
misc Annotation - Deficiency Notice Tue 04/22 8:35 AM
NOTICE TO FILER re DE#16 : The wrong event was used. The correct event should be Memorandum in Support. (ad)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
20 20 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/22 9:36 AM
SUMMONS returned executed by Thasha A. Boyd. Kevin Miller served on 4/2/2025; Charles R. Mullins served on 3/31/2025; Ronald Ray Talbert served on 3/27/2025. (ad)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/22 9:03 AM
SUMMONS returned executed by Thasha A. Boyd. Alan L. Jakes served on 3/26/2025; Paul Holder Realty & Auction served on 3/26/2025; Dorinda Walker served on 3/26/2025; Livia Walker served on 3/26/2025. (ad)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 04/22 8:43 AM
RESPONSE/Plaintiff's Combined: 1) Response and Objection to Jakes and PHRA Defendants' Motion(s) re10 and13 for Transfer of Venue and/or Motion to Dismiss: and 2) Motion to Maintain Venue in/under this District and Division filed by Thasha A. Boyd. (ad)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Dismiss Mon 04/21 12:53 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Charles R. Mullins.(Statum, Fred)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
15 15 motion Dismiss Mon 04/21 12:51 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Charles R. Mullins. (Statum, Fred)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
misc Annotation - Bar Status Thu 04/10 8:56 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Mark A. Polk admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
14 14 3 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Wed 04/09 12:25 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of13 MOTION to Dismiss Or In The Alternative To Transfer Venue, Or In The Alternative, Motion For Extension Of Time To File Responsive Pleading To Complaint And Response To Plaintiffs Motion For Jurisdiction Of State Claims/Cases filed by Alan L. Jakes . (Polk, Mark)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Dismiss Wed 04/09 12:20 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Or In The Alternative To Transfer Venue, Or In The Alternative, Motion For Extension Of Time To File Responsive Pleading To Complaint And Response To Plaintiffs Motion For Jurisdiction Of State Claims/Cases by Alan L. Jakes. (Polk, Mark)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/09 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Polk on behalf of Alan L. Jakes (Polk, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
11 11 3 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Mon 04/07 4:59 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of10 MOTION for Transfer of Venue or, in the Alternative, Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Complaint and Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Jurisdiction of State Claims/Cases filed by Kevin Miller, Paul Holder Realty & Auction, Dorinda Walker, Livia Walker . (Burns, Robert)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/07 4:57 PM
MOTION for Transfer of Venue or, in the Alternative, Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Complaint and Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Jurisdiction of State Claims/Cases by Kevin Miller, Paul Holder Realty & Auction, Dorinda Walker, Livia Walker.(Burns, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Email 4.4.25 RMB to Pltf re request for extension of time
misc Annotation - Bar Status Mon 04/07 10:39 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert M. Burns, Hannah Grace Moore admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/04 9:30 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Grace Moore on behalf of Kevin Miller, Paul Holder Realty & Auction, Dorinda Walker, Livia Walker (Moore, Hannah)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/04 9:29 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Burns on behalf of Kevin Miller, Paul Holder Realty & Auction, Dorinda Walker, Livia Walker (Burns, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
7 7 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Tue 03/25 3:18 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ab)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Tue 03/25 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ab)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Tue 03/25 3:17 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ab)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Change Venue Tue 03/25 3:16 PM
MOTION for Jurisdiction of State Claims/Cases by Thasha A. Boyd. (ab)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 03/25 3:14 PM
MOTION to Join Electronic Case Filing System by Thasha A. Boyd. (ab)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 03/25 3:12 PM
Summons issued as to Alan L. Jakes, Kevin Miller, Charles R. Mullins, Paul Holder Realty & Auction, Ronald Ray Talbert, Dorinda Walker, Livia Walker. (ab)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/25 3:12 PM
COMPLAINT against Alan L. Jakes, John Does I-X, Kevin Miller, Charles R. Mullins, Paul Holder Realty & Auction, Ronald Ray Talbert, Dorinda Walker, Livia Walker (Filing fee $405, Receipt number 300005242), filed by Thasha A. Boyd.(ab)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Collective Exhibits,
Att: 2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Attachment Receipt
misc Annotation - Docket Tue 03/25 3:43 PM
Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included.) (ab)
Related: [-]