Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Aleta A Trauger
Case #: 3:25-cv-00336
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
4 4 1 pgs order Order Wed 04/09 4:19 PM
ORDER: Petitioner John Allen Hessmer, an inmate of the South Central Correctional Facility in Clifton, Tennessee, has filed a pro se petition for writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254. (Doc. No.1 ). The court cannot consider a habeas petition under Section 2254 until Petitioner has submitted the filing fee or has been granted pauper status. Accordingly, within 30 days of entry of this Order, Petitioner is DIRECTED to either submit the required IFP Application and certificate or the full filing fee of five dollars ($5.00) to the Clerk of Court. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/9/2025. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail including IFP form) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ch)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
3 3 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Tue 03/25 1:50 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (sb)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Tue 03/25 1:49 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (sb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Tue 03/25 1:48 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by John Allen Hessmer.(sb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 1
misc Annotation - Docket Tue 03/25 1:51 PM
Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (Docket Sheet, Certificate of Service form, and Notice of Consent form included). (sb)
Related: [-]