Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Beth Bloom
Referred: Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein
Case #: 1:25-cv-21377
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 25, 2025 4:14 PM EDT
Defendant
CHAI & ZENG LLC
Defendant
FONDA SABANETA LLC
Defendant
INCA GROUP LLC
Defendant
SPI SUNSET LLC
Defendant
TROPICAL SUPERMARKET NO. 15 INC.
Plaintiff
Nigel Frank De La Torre Pardo
Represented By
Anthony Joseph Perez
Anthony J. Perez Law Group, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
34 34 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/02 3:51 PM
Amended Certificate of Other Affiliates by SPI Sunset LLC identifying Other Affiliate Pedro O Rodriguez, Other Affiliate ANA V. RODRIGUEZ, Other Affiliate Jeferson Restrepo, Other Affiliate Michelle Giraldo, Other Affiliate Victor Bergamino, Other Affiliate Qiang W. Zeng, Other Affiliate Kang Zeng for SPI Sunset LLC (Allen, Bernard)
Related: [-]
33 33 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Fri 05/02 10:08 AM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant, TROPICAL SUPERMARKET NO. 15 INC. D/B/A PRESIDENTE SUPERMARKET NO. 22 by Nigel Frank De La Torre Pardo (Perez, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
32 32 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/30 7:49 AM
ORDER Setting Discovery Status Conference. ( Joint Discovery Status Report due by 6/30/2025., Final Status Conference Re: Discovery Matters set for 7/7/2025 01:00 PM via Zoom before Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein on 4/29/2025. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
31 31 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 04/30 7:46 AM
ORDER Setting Discovery Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein on 4/29/2025. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
30 30 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/29 5:40 PM
Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by SPI Sunset LLC. (Allen, Bernard)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Tue 04/29 1:14 PM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re28 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates. Note - Other Affiliates do not appear on the docket sheet. (ls)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
28 28 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 04/28 5:37 PM
Amended Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by SPI Sunset LLC (Allen, Bernard)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 04/28 12:30 PM
ORDER Setting Trial and Pre-Trial Schedule: ( Amended Pleadings due by 6/27/2025., Discovery due by 8/19/2025., Expert Discovery due by 8/19/2025., Joinder of Parties due by 6/27/2025., Mediation Deadline 9/2/2025., In Limine Motions due by 12/1/2025., Dispositive Motions due by 9/10/2025., Pretrial Stipulation due by 12/1/2025., Jury Trial set for 12/15/2025 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 12/9/2025 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/28/2025. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
26 26 2 pgs order Order of Requirements Mon 04/28 12:25 PM
Order in Actions brought under the Americans with Disabilities Act. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/28/2025. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
25 25 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Mon 04/28 12:21 PM
ORDER on Default Judgment Procedure: Plaintiff's Motion for Default Final Judgment or Notice of Joint Liability due 5/28/2025. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/28/2025. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Mon 04/28 9:09 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re20 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates Not Entered ; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates. Note - Other Affiliates do not appear on the docket sheet. (ls)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default - FORM Mon 04/28 8:22 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Fonda Sabaneta LLC, INCA Group LLC, Chai & Zeng LLC - Motions Terminated:19 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default,17 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default,18 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 4/28/2025. (ls)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
22 22 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Fri 04/25 6:35 PM
Notice and NON-CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge . Filed by Nigel Frank De La Torre Pardo (Perez, Anthony)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Fri 04/25 6:34 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Nigel Frank De La Torre Pardo(Perez, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
20 20 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 04/25 12:38 PM
Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by SPI Sunset LLC (Allen, Bernard)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT Fri 04/25 10:47 AM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to Chai & Zeng LLC by Nigel Frank De La Torre Pardo.(Perez, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Affidavit AJP Affidavit
18 18 motion CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT Fri 04/25 10:40 AM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to INCA Group LLC by Nigel Frank De La Torre Pardo.(Perez, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Affidavit AJP Affidavit
17 17 motion CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT Fri 04/25 10:35 AM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to Fonda Sabaneta LLC by Nigel Frank De La Torre Pardo.(Perez, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Affidavit AJP Affidavit
Thursday, April 17, 2025
16 16 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Thu 04/17 1:51 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER: THIS CAUSE is before the Court upon a sua sponte review of the record. Plaintiff served Defendants Fonda Sabaneta LLC, INCA Group LLC, and Chai & Zeng LLC on March 26, 2025, generating a response deadline of April 16, 2025. ECF Nos.5 ,6 ,7 . To date, Defendants Fonda Sabaneta LLC, Inca Group LLC, and Chai & Zeng LLC have failed to respond or request an extension of time in which to do so. Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Defendants Fonda Sabaneta LLC, Inca Group LLC, and Chai & Zeng LLC must file their responses to the Complaint on or before April 23, 2025. Failure to do so may result in appropriate sanctions, including the entry of default. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (tsn)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 04/17 1:34 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by May 7, 2025. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline Fri 04/18 7:41 AM
Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline: SPI Sunset LLC response/answer due 5/7/2025. (ls)(per DE #15)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline Fri 04/18 7:47 AM
Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline: Chai & Zeng LLC response/answer due 4/23/2025; Fonda Sabaneta LLC response/answer due 4/23/2025; INCA Group LLC response/answer due 4/23/2025. (ls)(per DE #16)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
14 14 motion Extension of Time Wed 04/16 3:36 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Complaint re1 Complaint, by SPI Sunset LLC. Attorney Bernard Allen added to party SPI Sunset LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 4/30/2025.(Allen, Bernard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/16 3:24 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Tropical Supermarket No. 15 Inc.. (Pidermann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
12 12 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/08 1:29 PM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates by Nigel Frank De La Torre Pardo identifying Other Affiliate Pablo Baez, AccessAble, Other Affiliate Jeferson Restrepo, Other Affiliate Pedro O. Rodriguez, Other Affiliate Ana V. Rodriguez, Other Affiliate SPI Sunset Manager, LLC, Other Affiliate Michelle Giraldo, Other Affiliate Victor Bergamino, Other Affiliate Qiang W. Zeng, Other Affiliate Kang Zeng for Nigel Frank De La Torre Pardo (Perez, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 04/04 4:46 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Yina Cabrera on behalf of Tropical Supermarket No. 15 Inc.. Attorney Yina Cabrera added to party Tropical Supermarket No. 15 Inc.(pty:dft). (Cabrera, Yina)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 04/04 4:43 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephanie Pidermann on behalf of Tropical Supermarket No. 15 Inc.. Attorney Stephanie Pidermann added to party Tropical Supermarket No. 15 Inc.(pty:dft). (Pidermann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
9 9 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Fri 03/28 8:29 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Nigel Frank De La Torre Pardo. SPI SUNSET LLC served on 3/27/2025, response/answer due 4/17/2025. (Perez, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
8 8 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Thu 03/27 9:32 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Nigel Frank De La Torre Pardo. TROPICAL SUPERMARKET NO. 15 INC. served on 3/26/2025, response/answer due 4/16/2025. (Perez, Anthony)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Thu 03/27 9:30 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Nigel Frank De La Torre Pardo. CHAI & ZENG LLC served on 3/26/2025, response/answer due 4/16/2025. (Perez, Anthony)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Thu 03/27 9:28 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Nigel Frank De La Torre Pardo. INCA GROUP LLC served on 3/26/2025, response/answer due 4/16/2025. (Perez, Anthony)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Thu 03/27 9:25 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Nigel Frank De La Torre Pardo. FONDA SABANETA LLC served on 3/26/2025, response/answer due 4/16/2025. (Perez, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
4 4 8 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Wed 03/26 9:55 AM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/25/2025. See attached document for full details. (amb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 03/25 4:09 PM
Summons Issued as to CHAI & ZENG LLC, FONDA SABANETA LLC, INCA GROUP LLC, SPI SUNSET LLC, TROPICAL SUPERMARKET NO. 15 INC.. (ksr)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 03/25 3:59 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ksr)
Related: [-]
1 1 21 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 03/25 3:18 PM
COMPLAINT against CHAI & ZENG LLC, FONDA SABANETA LLC, INCA GROUP LLC, SPI SUNSET LLC, TROPICAL SUPERMARKET NO. 15 INC.. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18312342, filed by Nigel Frank De La Torre Pardo.(Perez, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s),
Att: 3 Summon(s),
Att: 4 Summon(s),
Att: 5 Summon(s),
Att: 6 Summon(s)