California Central District Court
Judge:Sherilyn Peace Garnett
Referred: Karen E Scott
Case #: 2:25-cv-02602
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 3:01 AM PDT
Defendant
Luis Enrique Ayala
Defendant
PAO Group Inc
Defendant
DOES
Plaintiff
Marquise Bailey
Represented By
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, April 17, 2025
13 13 10 pgs order Order Fri 04/18 3:38 PM
ORDER DECLINING SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett: For the foregoing reasons, the Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's Unruh Act and any other construction- related accessibility claim. The Court therefore dismisses any such claims without prejudice. See 28 U.S.C. 1367(c)(4). (see document for further details) (bm)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
12 12 misc Response Mon 04/14 9:42 AM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Marquise Baileyto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,11 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Declaration
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
11 11 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Wed 04/02 10:34 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT SHOULD EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER THE STATE LAW CLAIM by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause within fourteen (14) days of this order. (iv)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Wed 04/02 10:31 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) STANDING ORDER RE PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. The court finds that good cause exists to institute a limited scheduling order for cases under the ADA involving physical barriers in places of public accommodation. (iv)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 04/01 4:59 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/27 3:07 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Luis Enrique Ayala and, PAO Group Inc. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 03/26 4:43 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 03/26 4:43 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 03/26 4:42 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
4 4 notice Summons Request Tue 03/25 1:42 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Marquise Bailey. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 03/25 1:41 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 03/25 1:40 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Marquise Bailey. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 03/25 1:40 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39372918 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Marquise Bailey(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]