Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Barbara D Holmes
Case #: 3:25-cv-00332
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, March 28, 2025
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/28 12:30 PM
NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT OF THE PARTIES TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES ARISING UNDER 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) by Plaintiff Harriett Olivia Todd. (kc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 03/27 2:38 PM
ORDER: Currently pending is Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis.2 . The filing includes a completed application to proceed without preparing fees or costs, as well as an affidavit in support of the application. (Id.) Upon review of the filing, Plaintiffs application2 is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 3/27/2025. (kc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/25 2:36 PM
NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT OF THE PARTIES TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES ARISING UNDER 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) (ad)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Tue 03/25 2:34 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ad)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 03/25 2:33 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Harriett Olivia Todd. (ad)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Social Security Complaint Tue 03/25 2:33 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $405, Receipt number 0), filed by Harriett Olivia Todd.(ad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeal Council Action,
Att: 2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet
misc Annotation - Bar Status Tue 03/25 2:37 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for April Adams Carr admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]