Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Aleta A Trauger
Case #: 3:25-cv-00338
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 9:10 AM CDT
Defendant
A & S Concepts, Inc.
Defendant
Anthony Trevino
Defendant
Shelley Trevino
Plaintiff
Chem-Dry, Inc.
Represented By
Timothy Loren Capria
Husch Blackwell Llp (nashville)
contact info
Richard Swor
Husch Blackwell Llp (nashville)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
9 9 motion Default (Rule 55(a) Entry of Default) Wed 05/07 2:55 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default as to A & S Concepts, Inc. by Chem-Dry, Inc..(Swor, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Declaration of Richard Swor
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Tue 04/22 2:55 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief served on A&S Concepts Inc on 04/01/2025, filed by Chem-Dry, Inc.. (Swor, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
7 7 service Summons Issued Tue 03/25 3:38 PM
Summons issued as to A & S Concepts, Inc., Anthony Trevino, Shelley Trevino. (ad)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Tue 03/25 3:35 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2025 at 02:30 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (ad)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Tue 03/25 3:28 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Tue 03/25 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ad)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Tue 03/25 3:27 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ad)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Business Entity Disclosure Statement Tue 03/25 3:27 PM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Chem-Dry, Inc. (ad)
Related: [-]
1 1 26 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 03/25 3:26 PM
COMPLAINT against A & S Concepts, Inc., Anthony Trevino, Shelley Trevino (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4286462), filed by Chem-Dry, Inc..(ad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - 205049,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - 73162101,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - 73513798,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - 76347034,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - 76347311,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - 77698666,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - 87722809,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - 88652528,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - 86652287,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - Default,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - Jan 16 Letter,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 - Cease and Desist,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13 - Second Cease and Desist Letter,
Att: 14 Attachment Index of Trademarks,
Att: 15 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet
misc Annotation - Bar Status Tue 03/25 3:37 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Timothy Loren Capria, Richard Swor admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]