Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Michael L Brown
Case #: 1:25-cv-01000
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause28:1338 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 12, 2025 7:00 AM EDT
Defendant
wudao77
Defendant
xiaoli-art
Defendant
xm-hms
Defendant
yu1131
Defendant
yuj262
Defendant
yusushi local
Defendant
Anju Fashion Home Textiles 1 Store
Defendant
Art Bear Store
Defendant
B Dropshipping Store
Defendant
BABAITEALILI12 Store
Defendant
BAOdC Store
Defendant
Babaite Family Exquisite Product 331 Store
Defendant
Babaite Simple Case 308 Store
Defendant
Balantine Store
Defendant
Bath life Store
Defendant
Beautiful Cherry Blossom Season Store
Defendant
Black Rose Exquisite Home Textile 1 Store
Defendant
Boutique Home Textile Products Shop Store
Defendant
BuckleClub Store
Defendant
Butterfly Orchid Store
Defendant
CHangC Store
Defendant
CSMY Home Textile Store
Defendant
CSMY Luxury Shower Curtain Door Mat Store
Defendant
Changzhou 1move Industrial Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Changzhou Aborl New Material Technology Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Chenchen Fashion Home Textiles 6 Store
Defendant
Coconut Household Items Store
Defendant
Comfort Zone A Store
Defendant
Cotton T-shirt Clothing ZQ5 Store
Defendant
DIYs 155 Store
Defendant
Decorative Painting Boutique Store
Defendant
Designer Brand Clothing Store
Defendant
Dio Store
Defendant
Domin#39
Defendant
Dongguan Chance Gift & Craft Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Dongguan Heitaoyi Rubber & Plastic Products Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Dongguan Muxian Technology Co., Ltd
Defendant
Dongguan Zhiyuan Crafts Co. Ltd.
Defendant
Dongyang Baiyun Anxin Wig Factory
Defendant
Dreamer Design Store
Defendant
Eason Store
Defendant
FJTNA Store
Defendant
Falg Withyoo NO.5 Store
Defendant
Fast International Co.,Ltd
Defendant
Flixon Store
Defendant
Foshan Grace Furniture Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Foshan Zhongchengchengpin Decoration Design Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Fultalk
Defendant
Fuzhou Action Electronic Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Global Canvas Poster Boutique Store
Defendant
Gongyi Miracle Trading Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Guangzhou Best Technology Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Guangzhou Chu Feiya Trade Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Guangzhou Glory Building Material Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Guangzhou Lindal Hair Products Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Guangzhou Three D Printing Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Guangzhou jian dan shangmao shanghang333
Defendant
Guess You Like It Store
Defendant
Gunez Store
Defendant
HOTSALECASE90 Store
Defendant
Hangzhou Lifc Import& Export Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Hangzhou Sobuy Technology Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Harz Reklam Dekorasyon
Defendant
Henan Selead Home Technology Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Henan Sumdor International Trading Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Home Goods Home Textile Boutique Store
Defendant
Huanhual House Store
Defendant
IronFinger Toy Store
Defendant
JATIMES LIMITED
Defendant
Jiangnan Cloth Factory
Defendant
Jiaxing Aifute Household Products Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Jinhua Sizhuitewei Trading Co., Ltd.
Defendant
JoannxuBag Store
Defendant
June Fashion Store
Defendant
KIKO LIVE
Defendant
Kaf Metal Sanayi Ticaret Limited Sirketi
Defendant
Keep The Time Store
Defendant
Kingskong Gift Industry Firm Qingtian
Defendant
LK029 Store
Defendant
LK034 Store
Defendant
LMR-oil painting art and wig
Defendant
Laumango Exclusive Store
Defendant
Laumango Home Decorative Store
Defendant
Luquan Aizhou E-Commerce Store
Defendant
Make Mug Store
Defendant
Mao Blanket
Defendant
Marco Zhenbaobao
Defendant
Mestreth Art 3C 008 Store Store
Defendant
Moet Store
Defendant
NewWorldOne Store
Defendant
Ningbo Chuangxiang Magnet Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Ningbo Mammutek Smart Technology Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Ningbo Nm Security Technology Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Ningbo Zhenzhi Import And Export Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Nuyoah-SW Store
Defendant
Optimal Service For You Store
Defendant
Pailou Art Factory Store
Defendant
Penzo Store
Defendant
Pleasure team Store
Defendant
Pujiang Yexi Crystal Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Qiang-Wig-Oil Painting
Defendant
Qingdao Lufa Arts & Crafts Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Quanzhou Baomao Trading Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Rainbow Canvas Painting Store
Defendant
Red Rose 2 Store
Defendant
RuiTing01 Store
Defendant
SONGQUAN ALILI 23 Store
Defendant
SP Blanket
Defendant
SQ DECOR ART Store
Defendant
Seafarer Resin Model Discount Store
Defendant
See Spring Store
Defendant
Self-Adhesive Wallpaper Store
Defendant
Sex Code Store
Defendant
Shanghai Kamal Trading Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shanghai Xifu Trading Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shenzhen Holiday Package And Display Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shenzhen Pled Lighting Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shenzhen Qianyuxun Jewelry Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shenzhen Yongzhi Plastic Mold Co.,ltd.
Defendant
Shenzhen Youni Art Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shenzhen Zhongtai Printing Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shipping 11042301701% Store
Defendant
Shop1100086339 Store
Defendant
Shop1100391737 Store
Defendant
Shop1102121770 Store
Defendant
Shop1102162897 Store
Defendant
Shop1102247995 Store
Defendant
Shop1102583099 Store
Defendant
Shop1102902108 Store
Defendant
Shop1102963628 Store
Defendant
Shop1102964250 Store
Defendant
Shop1102999635 Store
Defendant
Shop1103250243 Store
Defendant
Shop1103534848 Store
Defendant
Shop1103581044 Store
Defendant
Shop1103613607 Store
Defendant
Shop1103666293 Store
Defendant
Shop1103670154 Store
Defendant
Shop1103674151 Store
Defendant
Shop1103685961 Store
Defendant
Shop1103709334 Store
Defendant
Shop1103715088 Store
Defendant
Shop1103717665 Store
Defendant
Shop1103756035 Store
Defendant
Shop1103835517 Store
Defendant
Shop1103856814 Store
Defendant
Shop1103865710 Store
Defendant
Shop1103877813 Store
Defendant
Shop1103885778 Store
Defendant
Shop1103889687 Store
Defendant
Shop1103938276 Store
Defendant
Shop1103941390 Store
Defendant
Shop1103980033 Store
Defendant
Shop1103993519 Store
Defendant
Shop1103994517 Store
Defendant
Shop1103995506 Store
Defendant
Shop1104000217 Store
Defendant
Shop1104002539 Store
Defendant
Shop1104003973 Store
Defendant
Shop1104007523 Store
Defendant
Shop1104015009 Store
Defendant
Shop1104058671 Store
Defendant
Shop1104065688 Store
Defendant
Shop1104071624 Store
Defendant
Shop1104083164 Store
Defendant
Shop1104085560 Store
Defendant
Shop1104096579 Store
Defendant
Shop1104108336 Store
Defendant
Shop1104111485 Store
Defendant
Shop1104113394 Store
Defendant
Shop1104115576 Store
Defendant
Shop1104117736 Store
Defendant
Shop1104128208 Store
Defendant
Shop1104163258 Store
Defendant
Shop1104187577 Store
Defendant
Shop1104208827 Store
Defendant
Shop1104210039 Store
Defendant
Shop1104271220 Store
Defendant
Shop1104278905 Store
Defendant
Shop1104300125 Store
Defendant
Shop1104304284 Store
Defendant
Shop1104305262 Store
Defendant
Shop1104341727 Store
Defendant
Shop1104343666 Store
Defendant
Shop1104343764 Store
Defendant
Shop1104388091 Store
Defendant
Shop1104389234 Store
Defendant
Shop1104394239 Store
Defendant
Shop1104531043 Store
Defendant
Shop4928019 Store
Defendant
Shop5789733 Store
Defendant
Soft&Sweet-Shop
Defendant
Sun Flag Store
Defendant
Super Premium Products Store
Defendant
Suzhou Shunyimei Import And Export Trade Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Swan Dream Art Canvas Painting Store
Defendant
TNDGMB20
Defendant
TRMUG
Defendant
Taco Home Textile Store Store
Defendant
Teacup fashion
Defendant
That Teknoloji LTD STI
Defendant
The Home Curate Store
Defendant
Tongling Chuangkai Wax Industry Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Top-Level Figure Toy Store
Defendant
TopMe Fashion Store
Defendant
Welcome to Boutique Store
Defendant
White Art Store
Defendant
Wuhan Missyuan Trade Co., Ltd.
Defendant
XIAOWANJIA
Defendant
XIONG11 Store
Defendant
Xiamen Mornsun Industrial Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Xiamen Siming District Jiehui Changrong Building Materials Business Department
Defendant
YUET SHUN INDUSTRIES LIMITED
Defendant
YW-Home Art Store
Defendant
Yangyang Fashion Home Textiles 1 Store
Defendant
YiWu TG Promo lmport & Export Co,LTD.
Defendant
Yiwu Dingyi E-Commerce Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Yiwu Hld Commodity Manufactory Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Yiwu Hongliang Crafts Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Yiwu Misong Trading Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Yiwu Nine Star Import & Export Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Yiwu Seqiao Painting Industry Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Yiwu Xitang Textile Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Yiwu Yuzhong Network Technology Co., Ltd.
Defendant
YuanMan Toys Store
Defendant
ZX3385
Defendant
Zhejiang Safewell Security Technology Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Zhejiang Shengye Traffic Signs Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Zhuzhou Wondove Garment Accessory Co., Ltd.
Defendant
adnuaa
Defendant
brandfig2024
Defendant
camdene_haith
Defendant
china_culture_500099
Defendant
collecting toys 8
Defendant
deven_citoble
Defendant
erkan
Defendant
furningnashop
Defendant
futureleta
Defendant
gar_hanners
Defendant
guoguoA Store
Defendant
huyingshangle
Defendant
lincangtingbonan-0
Defendant
linronghuang
Defendant
ngged_bolding
Defendant
owen_tionsthethelypre
Defendant
qingxiudedian Store
Defendant
quanjianhaotanG
Defendant
s Crib Store
Defendant
sansanzi
Defendant
shanda Store
Defendant
singe two
Plaintiff
The Estate of Marilyn Monroe LLC
Represented By
Jason Harris Cooper
The Sladkus Law Group
contact info
Carrie A. Hanlon
The Sladkus Law Group
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
yj0886
Terminated: 03/24/2025
Defendant
zenzguan
Terminated: 03/31/2025
Defendant
2012piaoyanguohai2012
Terminated: 03/31/2025
Defendant
Family Club Z
Terminated: 03/31/2025
Defendant
K Art Diamond Painting
Terminated: 04/07/2025


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Wed 04/30 10:10 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING23 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to yusushi local pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (pdt)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
23 23 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 04/25 6:08 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Round 5) filed by The Estate of Marilyn Monroe LLC (Hanlon, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Wed 04/23 2:29 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING22 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, without prejudice as to Gongyi Miracle Trading Co., Ltd., LMR-oil painting art and wig, Qiang-Wig-Oil Painting, Shenzhen Youni Art Co., Ltd., Soft&Sweet-Shop, Teacup fashion, and yu1131 only, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (tas)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
22 22 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 04/18 4:26 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Round 4) filed by The Estate of Marilyn Monroe LLC (Hanlon, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Mon 04/07 9:45 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING21 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to K Art Diamond Painting pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (pdt)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
21 21 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 04/04 10:36 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Round 3) filed by The Estate of Marilyn Monroe LLC (Hanlon, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Mon 03/31 9:34 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING20 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to 2012piaoyanguohai2012, Family Club Z, and zenzguan pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (pdt)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
20 20 2 pgs notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 03/28 4:34 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Round 2) filed by The Estate of Marilyn Monroe LLC (Hanlon, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
19 19 8 pgs order Preliminary Injunction Wed 03/26 4:21 PM
PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. The Court's previous Temporary Restraining Order, Asset Freeze Order, and Order to Show Case is dissolved and is replaced by this Preliminary Injunction Order which is hereafter in effect. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on this 26th day of March, 2025. (pdt)
Related: [-]
18 18 minutes Motion Hearing Wed 03/26 10:39 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael L. Brown: Preliminary injunction hearing held. Defendants failed to appear. For the reasons stated in the record, the Court GRANTED Plaintiff's2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. A separate order is forthcoming. (Court Reporter Jana Colter) (pdt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Unseal Case Tue 03/25 2:06 PM
ORDER granting16 MOTION to Lift Seal. The seal previously imposed pursuant to this Court's Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal is hereby lifted and all judicial records shall be made publicly available. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on this 25th day of March, 2025. (pdt)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Unseal Case Tue 03/25 12:42 PM
MOTION to Lift Seal by The Estate of Marilyn Monroe LLC.(bgt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
15 15 service Return of Service Executed Tue 03/25 12:41 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by The Estate of Marilyn Monroe LLC. Defendants served on 3/24/2025, Answers due 4/14/2025. (bgt)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING14 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice as to yj0886 pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (pdt)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
14 14 2 pgs NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41.a.1.i by The Estate of Marilyn Monroe LLC. (pdt) Modified on 3/25/2025 to amend file date (pdt).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
13 13 ORDER granting12 MOTION to extend ex parte temporary restraining order, asset freeze order, and order to show cause. The Court finds that Plaintiff has demonstrated good cause for an extension of the TRO for an additional fourteen (14) days to March 27, 2025. The hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is rescheduled and set before the Court on March 26, 2025 at 10:00 a.m., at which time Defendants and/or any other affected persons may challenge the appropriateness of the TRO and move to dissolve the same, and shall appear and show cause why a preliminary injunction should not issue. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on this 11th day of March, 2025. (pdt)
Related: [-]
12 12 MOTION to extend ex parte temporary restraining order, asset freeze order, and order to show cause by The Estate of Marilyn Monroe LLC.(bgt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Clerk's Certificate of Electronic Mailing as to plaintiff's counsel for The Estate of Marilyn Monroe LLC re13 Order. (pdt)
Related: [-]
NOTICE RESCHEDULING HEARING (by docket entry only): The Court reschedules the preliminary injunction hearing for 3/26/2025 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1906 before Judge Michael L. Brown. The Court will allow Defendants to appear remotely. Connection Instructions: Join ZoomGov Meeting https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1603366865. Meeting ID: 160 336 6865. Passcode: 911244. Telephone Number: 646-828-7666. The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available[LINK:here] . Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (jpk)
Related: [-]
Clerk's Certificate of Electronic Mailing as to counsel for The Estate of Marilyn Monroe LLC re 03/11/2025 Notice Rescheduling Hearing. (jpk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
NOTICE RESCHEDULING START TIME OF HEARING (by docket entry only): The Court reschedules the preliminary injunction hearing for 3/13/2025 at 11:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1906 before Judge Michael L. Brown. The Court will allow Defendants to appear remotely. Connection Instructions: Join ZoomGov Meeting https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1603366865. Meeting ID: 160 336 6865. Passcode: 911244. Telephone Number: 646-828-7666. The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available[LINK:here] . Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (jpk)
Related: [-]
Clerk's Certificate of Electronic Mailing as to counsel for The Estate of Marilyn Monroe LLC re 03/05/2025 Notice Rescheduling Start Time of Hearing. (jpk)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Via Email to Plaintiff's counsel as to The Estate of Marilyn Monroe LLC re1 Complaint. (pdt) Modified on 2/28/2025 to amend file date (pdt).
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING (by docket entry only): The Court SETS a preliminary injunction hearing for 3/13/2025 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1906 before Judge Michael L. Brown. The Court will allow Defendants to appear remotely. Connection Instructions: Join ZoomGov Meeting https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1603366865. Meeting ID: 160 336 6865. Passcode: 911244. Telephone Number: 646-828-7666. The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available[LINK:here] . Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (jpk)
Related: [-]
Clerk's Certificate of Electronic Mailing as to counsel for The Estate of Marilyn Monroe LLC re 02/28/2025 Notice of Hearing. (jpk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
11 11 6 pgs ORDER granting3 MOTION for Authorization to Serve Process on Defendants by Electronic Means Pursuant to FRCP 4(f)(3). The Court ORDERS as follows: Pursuant to Rule 4(f)(3), Plaintiff is authorized to provide notice of a TRO to Defendants, the Marketplaces, Financial Institutions and other third parties and to serve the Summonses, Complaint, TRO, and all subsequent pleadings and other documents on Defendants or their counsel in this action by electronic mail using email addresses provided by the Marketplaces, Financial Institutions, or Defendants themselves. Alternatively, Plaintiff may serve Defendants through the messaging platform provided by each Marketplace. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on this 27th day of February, 2025. (pdt)
Related: [-]
10 10 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ASSET FREEZE ORDER, AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Hearing set for 3/13/2025 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1906 before Judge Michael L. Brown. Any response or opposition to Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction must be served on Plaintiffs counsel by March 6, 2025 and filed with the Court, along with Proof of Service. Plaintiff shall file any reply memorandum prior to the hearing set for March 13, 2025. The above dates may be revised upon stipulation by all parties and approval of this Court. Defendants are on notice that failure to appear at the hearing may result in the imposition of a preliminary injunction against them pursuant to 15 U.S.C. §1116(d), Rule 65 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, 28 U.S.C. section 1651(a), and the Courts inherent authority. This Temporary Restraining Order expires within fourteen days unless the hearing on Plaintiffs motion for an order to show cause why a preliminary injunction should not issue cannot be heard within such time, in which case the Order shall remain in effect until the date of the hearing. This Temporary Restraining Order may be extended for good cause. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on this 27th day of February, 2025. (pdt)
Related: [-]
9 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on this 26th day of August, 2021. (pdt)
Related: [-]
8 8 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing via Email to Plaintiff's counsel re5 Order on Motion to Seal Case and6 Electronic Summons Issued. (pdt) Modified on 2/27/2025 to edit docket text (pdt).
Related: [-]
Submission of2 MOTION for Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order, Asset Freeze Order, and Order to Show Cause and3 MOTION for Authorization to Serve Process on Defendants by Electronic Means Pursuant to FRCP 4(f)(3) to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing via Email to Plaintiff's Counsel as to The Estate of Marilyn Monroe LLC re9 Standing Order,10 Order on Motion for TRO and11 Order on Motion for Service. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
7 7 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Estate of Marilyn Monroe LLC. (pdt)
Related: [-]
6 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (pdt)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER granting4 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on this 26th day of February, 2025. (pdt)
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by The Estate of Marilyn Monroe LLC. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to File Under Seal,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal
3 3 MOTION for Authorization to Serve Process on Defendants by Electronic Means Pursuant to FRCP 4(f)(3) by The Estate of Marilyn Monroe LLC.(pdt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Authorization to Serve Process on Defendant,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order on Motion for Authorization to Serve Process on Defendant
2 2 MOTION for Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order, Asset Freeze Order, and Order to Show Cause by The Estate of Marilyn Monroe LLC. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Ex Parte TRO,
Att: 2 Declaration of Kevin Wills,
Att: 3 Declaration of Jeffrey B. Sladkus,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order on Motion for Ex Parte TRO
1 1 21 pgs COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by The Estate of Marilyn Monroe LLC. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-14099573) (pdt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Plaintiff's Complaint,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet