Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Eleanor L Ross
Case #: 1:25-cv-01550
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1442 Petition for Removal - Suit against Federal Officer
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 08, 2025 4:35 AM EDT
Defendant
Change Healthcare Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Samuel Reed Rutherford
Alston & Bird, Llp - Ga
contact info
Caroline Rawls Strumph
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Defendant
Change Healthcare Technology Enabled Services, LLC
Represented By
Samuel Reed Rutherford
Alston & Bird, Llp - Ga
contact info
Caroline Rawls Strumph
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Defendant
Optum, Inc.
Represented By
Samuel Reed Rutherford
Alston & Bird, Llp - Ga
contact info
Caroline Rawls Strumph
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Defendant
OptumInsight, Inc.
Represented By
Samuel Reed Rutherford
Alston & Bird, Llp - Ga
contact info
Caroline Rawls Strumph
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Defendant
UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By
Samuel Reed Rutherford
Alston & Bird, Llp - Ga
contact info
Caroline Rawls Strumph
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nomi Health, Inc.
Represented By
Stephen Q. Wood
Quinn Emmanuel Urquart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Nathan Archibald
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Pranav Lokin
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
Robin Lynn McGrath
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 04/30 2:25 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Stay. All deadlines and proceedings in this matter are STAYED until further ordered by the Court. The parties shall provide written status reports every (60) days hereafter. The parties shall also file a status report upon receiving a final decision from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation regarding the transfer of this action to the MDL for pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 04/30/2025. (ajw)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Wed 04/30 12:15 PM
Submission of9 First MOTION to Remand to Superior Court of Gwinnett County, Georgia to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
16 16 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 04/28 7:26 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re9 First MOTION to Remand to Superior Court of Gwinnett County, Georgia filed by Nomi Health, Inc.. (McGrath, Robin)
Related: [-]
15 15 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 04/28 5:08 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re9 First MOTION to Remand to Superior Court of Gwinnett County, Georgia filed by Nomi Health, Inc.. (Wood, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
14 14 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 04/23 7:28 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 First MOTION to Remand to Superior Court of Gwinnett County, Georgia filed by Change Healthcare Solutions, LLC, Change Healthcare Technology Enabled Services, LLC, Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.(Rutherford, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Contract,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Contract,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Contract Amendment
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
order Order Wed 04/16 12:00 PM
MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only). On April 3, 2025, Plaintiff filed an Emergency Motion to Remand this case. [Doc. 9]. Although all other deadlines in this case are stayed pending the Court's ruling on Defendants' Emergency Motion to Stay [Doc. 7], in its discretion, the Court ORDERS the Parties to adhere to the following briefing schedule on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand: Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiff's motion on or before April 23, 2025, and Plaintiff shall file a reply on or before April 28, 2025. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 4/16/25. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
order Order on Motion for Oral Argument Wed 04/09 9:31 AM
MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only). The Court declines to schedule oral argument at this time but will revisit this request should it become necessary. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion for Oral Argument [Doc. 13] is DENIED. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 4/9/25. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
13 13 motion Oral Argument Mon 04/07 5:02 PM
MOTION for Oral Argument on Emergency Motion to Stay and Emergency Motion to Remand by Nomi Health, Inc.. (Lokin, Pranav)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Mon 04/07 8:52 AM
Submission of7 Emergency MOTION to Stay to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
12 12 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 04/04 4:52 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re7 Emergency MOTION to Stay filed by Change Healthcare Solutions, LLC, Change Healthcare Technology Enabled Services, LLC, Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Rutherford, Samuel)
Related: [-]
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Fri 04/04 1:29 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:11 APPLICATION for Admission of Nathan Archibald Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-14197374). Attorney Nathan Archibald added appearing on behalf of Nomi Health, Inc. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (esr)
Related: [-]
order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/04 4:10 PM
MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING [Doc. 11] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Nathan Archibald. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 4/4/25. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/04 4:11 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing (via email) to Attorney Nathan Archibald as to Nomi Health, Inc. re Order on Application for Admission PHV. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
11 11 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/03 5:24 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Nathan Archibald Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-14197374).by Nomi Health, Inc.. (McGrath, Robin)
Related: [-]
10 10 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 04/03 5:05 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re7 Emergency MOTION to Stay filed by Nomi Health, Inc..(McGrath, Robin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
9 9 motion Remand to State Court Thu 04/03 5:00 PM
First MOTION to Remand to State Court Superior Court of Gwinnett County, Georgia with Brief In Support by Nomi Health, Inc..(McGrath, Robin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Memorandum in support of Emergency Motion to Remand
Thursday, March 27, 2025
8 8 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/27 12:02 AM
APPLICATION for Admission of Stephen Q. Wood Pro Hac Vice.by Nomi Health, Inc.. (McGrath, Robin)
Related: [-]
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Thu 03/27 11:15 AM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:8 APPLICATION for Admission of Stephen Q. Wood Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-14172760). Attorney Stephen Q. Wood added appearing on behalf of Nomi Health, Inc. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (mh)
Related: [-]
order Order Thu 03/27 12:59 PM
MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only). Any response by Plaintiff to Defendants' Motion to Stay [Doc. 7] must be filed within seven (7) days of this order. The Court stays deadlines in the present case, including ones for the filing of a Motion to Dismiss, Rule 26(f) conference and report, and filing of Initial Disclosures, until after the Court's ruling on Defendants' Motion to Stay [Doc. 7]. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 3/27/25. (mlb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 03/27 1:01 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Attorneys Stephen Wood and Nathan Archibald as to Nomi Health, Inc. re Order. (mlb)
Related: [-]
order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/27 4:24 PM
MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stephen Q. Wood. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 3/27/25. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 03/27 4:25 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing (via email) to Attorney Stephen Q. Wood as to Nomi Health, Inc. re Order on Application for Admission PHV. (mlb) Modified on 3/27/2025 to edit text (mlb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
7 7 motion Stay Wed 03/26 9:58 PM
Emergency MOTION to Stay with Brief In Support by Change Healthcare Solutions, LLC, Change Healthcare Technology Enabled Services, LLC, Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.(Rutherford, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
misc Return of Application for Admission PHV Wed 03/26 2:09 PM
RETURN of6 APPLICATION for Admission of Stephen Q. Wood Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-14172760) to attorney for correction. Reason for Return: Applicant must provide the courts they are admitted to and the admission dates, including the highest court in the state of Utah. Please correct and resubmit. (esr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
6 6 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/25 7:39 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Stephen Q. Wood Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-14172760).by Nomi Health, Inc.. (McGrath, Robin)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Letter re:83.1 Tue 03/25 2:21 PM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Stephen Q. Wood. Clerk to follow-up by 4/4/2025. (jas)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Letter re:83.1 Tue 03/25 2:20 PM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Nathan Archibald. Clerk to follow-up by 4/4/2025. (jas)
Related: [-]
3 3 12 pgs order Order Tue 03/25 12:35 PM
NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/25 12:07 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Change Healthcare Solutions, LLC, Change Healthcare Technology Enabled Services, LLC, Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group Incorporated for Change Healthcare Solutions, LLC, Change Healthcare Technology Enabled Services, LLC, Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc.. (Rutherford, Samuel)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Tue 03/25 12:34 PM
Clerk's Notation re2 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Change Healthcare Solutions, LLC, Change Healthcare Technology Enabled Services, LLC, Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group Incorporated for Change Healthcare Solutions, LLC, Change Healthcare Technology Enabled Services, LLC, Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc.. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 03/25 11:19 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, OptumInsight, Inc., Optum, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-14168145)(tcc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet