Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steve C Jones
Case #: 2:25-cv-00075
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 6:08 AM EDT
Defendant
ABC Corps 1-3
Defendant
John/Jane Doe
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Plaintiff
Tina Chavers
Represented By
Steven Nathaniel Jones
The Law Office Of Steven N. Jones, LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
Terminated: 04/24/2025
Represented By
Nicholas Elias Deeb
Mclain & Merritt, P.C.
contact info
Jackson Taylor
Mclain & Merritt
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
16 16 order Scheduling Order Thu 04/24 5:34 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER re:9 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Fact discovery closes on October 24, 2025. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 4/24/2025. (rsg)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/24 4:57 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Tina Chavers. (Jones, Steven)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Protective Order Thu 04/24 2:28 PM
CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 4/24/2025. (rsg)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs order Order Thu 04/24 2:27 PM
ORDER re8 Proposed Consent Order. After careful review and consideration, the proposed order is APPROVED with the addition of the provision detailing procedure to be followed for the sealing of confidential documents. As a general matter, this Court will seal only those items enumerated in the Court's Standing Order 04-02 regarding sensitive information and public access to electronic case files. If a party has very good cause to request sealing of material marked or identified as CONFIDENTIAL,said party, after notification to the opposing party, may file a motion to seal in accordance with the Court's Procedures for Electronic Filing Documents Under Seal, located in Section II(J) of Appendix H. The material subject to the seal request should be attached as an exhibit to the motion. The Clerk will enter the motion on the docket, without public viewing access. After entry on the docket, the Court will review the material in camera and decide whether to grant or deny the motion to seal. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 4/24/2025. (rsg)
Related: [-]
12 12 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Thu 04/24 2:21 PM
CONSENT ORDER SUBSTITUTING DEFENDANT: ORDERED that WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP shall be substituted as a Defendant in lieu of Walmart Inc. The caption shall be amended to reflect that Wal-Mart Stores East, LP is the sole corporate Walmart Defendant. Plaintiff need not file an Amended Complaint to reflect this substitution, and Defendant need not file any further Answer. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP added. Walmart Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 4/24/25. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
11 11 discov Initial Disclosures Tue 04/22 4:19 PM
Initial Disclosures by Walmart Inc..(Deeb, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
10 10 discov Certificate of Service Tue 04/22 4:07 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Tina Chavers.(Jones, Steven)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Tue 04/22 3:55 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Walmart Inc.. (Deeb, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Proposed Consent Order Tue 04/22 3:55 PM
Proposed CONSENT ORDER Consent Protective Order. (Deeb, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Proposed Consent Order Tue 04/22 3:53 PM
Proposed CONSENT ORDER Substituting Wal-Mart Stores East, LP for Walmart Inc.. (Deeb, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
6 6 misc Leave of Absence Wed 04/16 10:34 AM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 05/21-05/26/2025, 10/13-10/17/2025, 11/24-11/28/25, 12/19/25-01/06/26, by Steven Nathaniel Jones. (Jones, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
5 5 discov Certificate of Service Tue 04/15 6:14 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walmart Inc..(Bagiatis, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Filing Thu 04/03 2:53 PM
COURT'S NOTICE of Filing Standing Order - INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TOTHE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES. (pdw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
3 3 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Tue 04/01 3:59 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Steve C. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Richard W. Story no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 2:25-CV-0075-SCJ. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 04/01/2025. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
2 2 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/26 10:39 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Walmart Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Other Affiliate Sam's East, Inc., Other Affiliate Sam's Real Estate Business Trust, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Other Affiliate ASDA Group Limited, Other Affiliate Beaver Lake Aviation, Inc., Other Affiliate Bharti Walmart Private Limited, Other Affiliate Corporacion de Companias Agroindustriales, Other Affiliate Corporacion de Supermercados Unidos S.A., Other Affiliate Massmart Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Sam's West, Inc., Other Affiliate Texas Retail Energy, LLC, Other Affiliate The Seiyu, Ltd., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Argentina S.R.L., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Brasil, Ltda., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Canada Corp., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart China Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Leasing, Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Other Affiliate WMS Supermercados do Brasil, S.A. (formerly Sonae Distribuicao Brasil S.A.), Other Affiliate Walmart Claims Services, Inc. (formerly known as Claims Management, Inc.), Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Other Affiliate Central American Retail Holding Company NV, Other Affiliate Distribucion y Servicio D&S SA, Other Affiliate La Fruga SA, Other Affiliate WAL-MART.COM USA LLC, Other Affiliate Walmart de Mexico, SA de CV, Other Affiliate WAL-MART PUERTO RICO INC for Walmart Inc.. (Deeb, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
1 1 8 pgs cmp Notice of Removal Tue 03/25 3:36 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Walmart Inc.. (Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number AGANDC-14171061)(rsg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Answers to Interrogatories and Responses to Request for Production,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - State Court Pleadings,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet