Virgin Islands District Court
Judge:Wilma A Lewis
Referred: Emile A Henderson, III
Case #: 1:25-cv-00017
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 5:46 AM AST
Defendant
United States of America
Defendant
Gordon Rhea
Department of Justice Attorney General Department of Justice 6151 Estate La Reine
Kingshill, VI 00850
Represented By
Christopher M. Timmons
Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Stefan Michalopoulos
503 Lagrange Hill
Fredericksted, VI 00840


Docket last updated: 89 minutes ago
Monday, May 19, 2025
27 27 motion Hearing Tue 05/20 1:11 PM
MOTION for Hearing by Plaintiff Stefan Michalopoulos. (TNS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
26 26 misc CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT Wed 04/30 11:30 AM
CERTIFIED MAIL return receipt Re:22 Hard Copy Notice of filing (TSJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
25 25 misc Affidavit Mon 04/28 12:12 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service re23 Objection to Report and Recommendations by Stefan Michalopoulos. (AM)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Affidavit Mon 04/28 12:06 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service re21 Request for Timing is of Essence: Status Conference Restraining Order Hearing by Stefan Michalopoulos. (AM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
23 23 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendations Thu 04/24 4:30 PM
OBJECTION to20 Report and Recommendations by Stefan Michalopoulos. (TNS)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Hard Copy (Paper) Notice of Filing Thu 04/24 3:40 PM
HARD COPY NOTICE of filing sent to Stefan Michalopoulos Related Document:20 (TSJ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mail Envelope
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
21 21 misc Docket Annotation Wed 04/23 5:31 PM
Request for Timing is of Essence: Status Conference Restraining Order Hearing by Pltf Michalopoulos. (TNS)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Report and Recommendations Wed 04/23 12:00 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (EAH) dated 04/23/2025 re2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Stefan Michalopoulos. Objections to R&R due by 5/7/2025. (BMS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
19 19 misc CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT Wed 04/09 3:20 PM
CERTIFIED MAIL return receipt as executed. Re:14 Hard Copy Notice of filing (KW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
18 18 misc Affidavit Tue 04/08 3:20 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service re17 Reply to Opposition to Motion by Stefan Michalopoulos. (AM)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
17 17 respm Reply to Opposition to Motion Mon 04/07 3:34 PM
REPLY to Opposition to Motion re16 Opposition to Motion filed by Plaintiff Stefan Michalopoulos. (TNS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
misc Notice of Corrected Docket Entry Thu 04/03 8:24 AM
NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY Re:16 Opposition to Motion. Event and PDF do not match counsel needs to refile correctly. (TNS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
16 16 respm Opposition to Motion Wed 04/02 2:02 PM
Opposition to Motion re2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Gordon Rhea. (Timmons, Christopher)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/02 2:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Timmons on behalf of Defendant Gordon Rhea (Timmons, Christopher)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Hard Copy (Paper) Notice of Filing Wed 04/02 9:31 AM
HARD COPY NOTICE of filing sent certified mail to Stefan Michalopoulos Related Document:13 (KW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order Referring Motion Tue 04/01 2:40 PM
ORDER (WAL) dated 04/01/2025. REFERRING Plaintiff Stefan Michalopoulos's2 "Ex-Parte Notice of Motion; Restraining Order; Preliminary Injunction; Early Discovery/Disclosure" to Magistrate Judge Emile A. Henderson III for a Report and Recommendation. (EDW)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice ~Notice (Other) Tue 04/01 9:37 AM
NOTICE of filing registered mail receipt by Stefan Michalopoulos, in re:10 . (TNS)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice ~Notice (Other) Tue 04/01 9:35 AM
NOTICE of filing registered mail receipt by Stefan Michalopoulos. in re9 . (TNS)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/31 2:59 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed on Honorable Pam Bondi via certified mail by Stefan Michalopoulos. (TNS)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/31 2:56 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed via certified mail to Honorable Kash Patel. (TNS)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/31 2:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed on Paula Henderson for Gordon Rhea on 3/28/25. (TNS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
7 7 misc Notice to Parties of Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to MagJudge Wed 03/26 12:41 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge issued via upload. (TNS)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 03/26 12:30 PM
Summons Issued as to Attorney General Gordon Rhea. (TNS)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 03/26 12:29 PM
Summons Issued as to Pam Bond. (TNS)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 03/26 12:27 PM
Summons Issued as to Kash Patel. (TNS)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Motion/Application) Wed 03/26 10:48 AM
MOTION/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Stefan Michalopoulos. (TNS)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Temporary Restraining Order Wed 03/26 10:30 AM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Stefan Michalopoulos. #1 part 2) #2 TRO part 3) (TNS)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs misc Complaint with IFP Pending Tue 03/25 5:04 PM
COMPLAINT against United States of America LODGED pending disposition of motion to proceed in forma pauperis.filed by Stefan Michalopoulos. (TNS)
Related: [-]